EP4302689 - SPIROMETRY FILTER AND A SPIROMETRY FILTER-FLOW TRANSDUCER COMBINATION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 20.06.2024 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 08.12.2023 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.07.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Medikro Oy Pioneerinkatu 3 70800 Kuopio / FI | [2024/02] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
POHJOLAINEN, Olli-Pekka Ilmari 70820 Kuopio / FI | 02 /
LIPPONEN, Mika Petri 70420 Kuopio / FI | 03 /
ELORANTA, Tuukka Juhana 70300 Kuopio / FI | [2024/02] | Representative(s) | Berggren Oy P.O. Box 16 Eteläinen Rautatiekatu 10A 00101 Helsinki / FI | [2024/02] | Application number, filing date | 22397503.8 | 04.07.2022 | [2024/02] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4302689 | Date: | 10.01.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/02] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.12.2022 | Classification | IPC: | A61B5/097 | [2024/02] | CPC: |
A61B5/087 (EP);
A61B5/097 (EP);
A61B2562/0247 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/30] |
Former [2024/02] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SPIROMETRIEFILTER UND SPIROMETRIEFILTER-DURCHFLUSSUMFORMERKOMBINATION | [2024/02] | English: | SPIROMETRY FILTER AND A SPIROMETRY FILTER-FLOW TRANSDUCER COMBINATION | [2024/02] | French: | COMBINAISON D'UN FILTRE DE SPIROMÉTRIE ET D'UN TRANSDUCTEUR DE DÉBIT DE FILTRE DE SPIROMÉTRIE | [2024/02] | Examination procedure | 18.06.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 18.06.2024 | Examination requested [2024/30] | 18.06.2024 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.07.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [IA]US5390668 (LEHMAN ARLIN [US]) [I] 1-10 * the whole document * [A] 11-15; | [XI]US2003120169 (JONES TERRENCE K [US], et al) [X] 1,11-15 * abstract; paragraph [0030] - paragraph [0060]; figures 1-12 * [I] 2-10; | [XA]WO2011143289 (UNIV DALHOUSIE [CA], et al) [X] 1-10 * paragraph [0019] - paragraph [0034]; figures 1-5; claim 4 * [A] 11-15; | [A]US9861299 (JONES WILLIAM [US], et al) [A] 1-15* the whole document *; | [A]US10466082 (BIRCH DAVID [GB], et al) [A] 1-15 * the whole document * |