Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP4098120 | Global Dossier | 19.06.2024 | B1 | EP4098120 | 07.12.2022 | A1 | Priority number | Date | DE102021114405 | 03.06.2021 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE102021114405 | 08.12.2022 | A1 | Priority number | Date | DE102021114405 | 03.06.2021 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | DK4098120T | 22.07.2024 | T3 | Priority number | Date | DE102021114405 | 03.06.2021 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | PL4098120T | 19.08.2024 | T3 | Priority number | Date | DE102021114405 | 03.06.2021 |