EP4311760 - VEHICLE PROPULSION CONTROL HANDLE, ESPECIALLY FOR UNDERWATER VEHICLES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 08.09.2024 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 22.03.2024 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 29.12.2023 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.09.2024 | New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Stowarzyszenie B-4 Ul. Zagloby 7B 35-304 Rzeszów / PL | [2024/05] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Piatek, Piotr 38-100 Strzyzów / PL | [2024/05] | Representative(s) | Warzybok, Tadeusz Biuro Patentowe "INICJATOR" Sp.z o.o. ul. Zolkiewskiego 7B/1 35-203 Rzeszow / PL | [2024/05] | Application number, filing date | 22460033.8 | 28.07.2022 | [2024/05] | Filing language | PL | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4311760 | Date: | 31.01.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/05] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 31.01.2023 | Classification | IPC: | G05D1/00 | [2024/34] | CPC: |
B63H21/213 (EP);
G05G1/01 (EP);
B63H2025/026 (EP);
G05G1/04 (EP);
G05G1/10 (EP);
G05G5/065 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2024/05] | B63H21/21, G05D1/02, G05G9/047 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/17] |
Former [2024/05] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | STEUERHEBEL FÜR EINEN FAHRZEUGANTRIEB, INSBESONDERE FÜR UNTERWASSERFAHRZEUGE. | [2024/05] | English: | VEHICLE PROPULSION CONTROL HANDLE, ESPECIALLY FOR UNDERWATER VEHICLES | [2024/05] | French: | POIGNÉE DE COMMANDE DE PROPULSION DE VÉHICULES, NOTAMMENT DE VÉHICULES SOUS-MARINS. | [2024/05] | Examination procedure | 15.03.2024 | Examination requested [2024/17] | 15.03.2024 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 09.09.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.06.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2018356907 (PARAZYNSKI SCOTT EDWARD [US], et al); | [AD]CN113018801 (SHENZHEN ZHONGTIAN DIVING EQUIPMENT CO LTD) | by applicant | PL124239B | US2002090866 | US6675733 | US2007141924 | CN113018801 |