EP4191020 - SATELLITE PUMP [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 05.05.2023 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.12.2023 | The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Politechnika Gdanska ul. Gabriela Narutowicza 11/12 80-233 Gdansk / PL | [2023/23] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Sliwinski, Pawel 80-766 Gdynia / PL | [2023/23] | Representative(s) | Pawlowska-Bajerska, Justyna Gdansk University of Technology ul. G. Narutowicza 11/12 80-233 Gdansk / PL | [N/P] |
Former [2023/23] | Pawlowska, Justyna Gdansk University of Technology ul. G. Narutowicza 11/12 80-233 Gdansk / PL | Application number, filing date | 22460060.1 | 16.11.2022 | [2023/23] | Priority number, date | PL20210439702 | 01.12.2021 Original published format: PL 43970221 | [2023/23] | Filing language | PL | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4191020 | Date: | 07.06.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/23] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.05.2023 | Classification | IPC: | F01C1/14, F04C2/14 | [2023/23] | CPC: |
F04C2/14 (EP);
F04C15/06 (EP);
F04C2240/30 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, ME, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/23] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SATELLITENPUMPE | [2023/23] | English: | SATELLITE PUMP | [2023/23] | French: | POMPE SATELLITE | [2023/23] | Examination procedure | 29.11.2022 | Examination requested [2023/23] | 08.08.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 15.09.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]US3852002 (SIENIAWSKI B) [AD] 1-6* the whole document *; | [A]US4674964 (HERTELL SIEGFRIED [DE]) [A] 1-6 * figure 6 *; | [A]CN202402575U (NINGBO HELM TOWER HYDRAULIC MOTOR CO LTD) [A] 1-6 * the whole document *; | [A]EP3187733 (FAMA SPÓLKA Z OGRANICZONA ODPOWIEDZIALNOSCIA [PL]) [A] 1-6 * paragraphs [0003] , [0004] , [0010] , [0011] * * figures 1-5 * | by applicant | PL71329B | PL215061 | PL219147 | PL185724B | PL391422 |