EP4275902 - HEAT EXCHANGER CORE LAYER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 17.05.2024 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 13.10.2023 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.05.2024 | The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established | 17.05.2024 | Request for examination filed | published on 19.06.2024 [2024/25] | 17.05.2024 | Change - designated states | published on 19.06.2024 [2024/25] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hamilton Sundstrand Corporation Four Coliseum Centre 2730 West Tyvola Road Charlotte, NC 28217 / US | [2023/46] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
M CZKOWSKI, Tomasz 51-317 Wroclaw / PL | 02 /
SIUDZI SKI, Hubert 51-317 Wroclaw / PL | [2023/46] | Representative(s) | Dehns St. Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | [2023/46] | Application number, filing date | 22461547.6 | 11.05.2022 | [2023/46] | Filing language | PL | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4275902 | Date: | 15.11.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/46] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 31.10.2022 | Classification | IPC: | B33Y80/00, F28D9/00, F28F3/02, F28F21/08 | [2023/46] | CPC: |
F28D9/0056 (EP);
F28F3/022 (EP,US);
B33Y80/00 (EP,US);
F28F3/044 (US);
F28F3/048 (EP);
B22F10/28 (US);
B33Y10/00 (US);
F28F21/08 (US);
F28F21/083 (EP);
F28F21/084 (EP);
F28F21/085 (EP);
F28F21/086 (EP);
F28F21/087 (EP);
F28F2215/10 (EP);
F28F2250/02 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/25] |
Former [2023/46] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | KERNSCHICHT FÜR WÄRMETAUSCHER | [2023/46] | English: | HEAT EXCHANGER CORE LAYER | [2023/46] | French: | COUCHE DE NOYAU D'ÉCHANGEUR DE CHALEUR | [2023/46] | Examination procedure | 14.05.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 14.05.2024 | Examination requested [2024/25] | 14.05.2024 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]WO2005033607 (HIFLUX LTD [GB], et al) [X] 1,2,4-13 * figure 11 * [I] 3; | [A]US2007131386 (TSAI MING-KUN [TW]) [A] 1-13* the whole document *; | [XI]EP3258203 (HAMILTON SUNDSTRAND CORP [US]) [X] 1,2,4-13 * figures 3E,3F * [I] 3; | [XI]CN113309578 (UNIV NANJING AERONAUTICS & ASTRONAUTICS) [X] 1,2,4-13 * figure - * [I] 3 |