EP4346526 - CAP UNIT AND CONTAINER WITH CAP [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 08.03.2024 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 02.12.2022 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 28.01.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.07.2024 | Change: Validation states | published on 28.08.2024 [2024/35] | 26.07.2024 | Change - extension states | published on 28.08.2024 [2024/35] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Thermos K.K. 1435, Yoshida-Shimonakano Tsubame-shi, Niigata-ken / JP | For all designated states Thermos L.L.C. 475 N. Martingale Road Suite 1100 Schaumburg, IL 60173 / US | [2024/15] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ITO, Kei Yoshida-Shimonakano Tsubame-shi Niigata-ken / JP | 02 /
MATSUYAMA, Shin Yoshida-Shimonakano Tsubame-shi Niigata-ken / JP | [2024/15] | Representative(s) | Barker Brettell LLP 100 Hagley Road Edgbaston Birmingham, West Midlands B16 8QQ / GB | [2024/15] | Application number, filing date | 22700257.3 | 13.01.2022 | [2024/15] | WO2022IB50255 | Priority number, date | JP20210087781 | 25.05.2021 Original published format: JP 2021087781 | [2024/15] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2022248942 | Date: | 01.12.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/48] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4346526 | Date: | 10.04.2024 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 01.12.2022 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2024/15] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 01.12.2022 | Classification | IPC: | A47J41/00, A47G19/22, B65D47/28 | [2024/15] | CPC: |
A47J41/0022 (EP);
B65D47/286 (EP,KR);
B65D41/04 (CN);
A47G19/2272 (EP);
B65D39/04 (KR);
B65D43/022 (EP);
B65D47/06 (CN);
B65D51/1605 (CN);
B65D81/3806 (CN);
B65D81/3841 (EP);
B65D85/72 (KR);
B65D2543/00046 (EP);
B65D2543/00092 (EP);
B65D2543/00296 (EP);
B65D2543/00564 (EP);
B65D2543/00972 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/15] | Title | German: | VERSCHLUSSKAPPE UND BEHÄLTER MIT VERSCHLUSSKAPPE | [2024/15] | English: | CAP UNIT AND CONTAINER WITH CAP | [2024/15] | French: | UNITÉ DE CAPUCHON ET RÉCIPIENT DOTÉ D'UN CAPUCHON | [2024/15] | Entry into regional phase | 20.10.2023 | National basic fee paid | 20.10.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 20.10.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 20.10.2023 | Examination requested [2024/15] | 20.10.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 09.07.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.01.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]JPS59159548U ; | [XYI]KR20190089302 (LEE JUNG HO [KR]); | [YA]US10870522 (LANE MARVIN [US]) | by applicant | JP2015166258 |