EP4278847 - TERMINAL REDIRECTION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 20.10.2023 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 22.07.2022 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 02.02.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.03.2024 | Change: Validation states | published on 24.04.2024 [2024/17] | 22.03.2024 | Change - extension states | published on 24.04.2024 [2024/17] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Nokia Technologies Oy Karakaari 7 02610 Espoo / FI | [2023/47] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CHANDRASHEKAR, Subramanya Bangalore 560079 / IN | 02 /
HENTTONEN, Tero 02760 Espoo / FI | 03 /
KOSKELA, Jarkko Tuomo 90510 Oulu / FI | 04 /
KOSKINEN, Jussi-Pekka 90420 Oulu / FI | [2023/47] | Representative(s) | Mudge, Kevin Bryers Intellectual Property Ltd Bristol & Bath Science Park Dirac Crescent Emersons Green Bristol BS16 7FR / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2023/47] | Nokia EPO representatives Nokia Technologies Oy Karakaari 7 02610 Espoo / FI | Application number, filing date | 22700547.7 | 03.01.2022 | [2023/47] | WO2022EP50017 | Priority number, date | IN202141002174 | 18.01.2021 Original published format: IN202141002174 | [2023/47] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2022152584 | Date: | 21.07.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/29] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4278847 | Date: | 22.11.2023 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.07.2022 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2023/47] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 21.07.2022 | Classification | IPC: | H04W76/27, H04W36/08, H04W36/18, H04W88/06, H04W36/34, H04W74/08 | [2023/47] | CPC: |
H04W76/27 (EP,US);
H04W36/0033 (US);
H04W36/00698 (EP,US);
H04W36/08 (EP,US);
H04W36/34 (EP);
H04W76/19 (EP);
H04W88/06 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/47] | Title | German: | ENDGERÄTEUMLEITUNG | [2023/47] | English: | TERMINAL REDIRECTION | [2023/47] | French: | REDIRECTION DE TERMINAL | [2023/47] | Entry into regional phase | 18.08.2023 | National basic fee paid | 18.08.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 18.08.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 14.07.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 18.08.2023 | Examination requested [2023/47] | 18.08.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.12.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XYI]WO2020084595 (ERICSSON TELEFON AB L M [SE]); |