EP4285126 - MEASUREMENT DEVICE FOR DIFFERENTIAL VOLTAGE MEASUREMENT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 03.11.2023 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 05.08.2022 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 02.02.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.03.2024 | Change: Validation states | published on 01.05.2024 [2024/18] | 29.03.2024 | Change - extension states | published on 01.05.2024 [2024/18] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BSH Hausgeräte GmbH Carl-Wery-Strasse 34 81739 München / DE | [2023/49] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SCHMID, Florian 93173 Wenzenbach / DE | [2023/49] | Application number, filing date | 22700620.2 | 13.01.2022 | [2023/49] | WO2022EP50624 | Priority number, date | DE202110200762 | 28.01.2021 Original published format: DE102021200762 | [2023/49] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2022161779 | Date: | 04.08.2022 | Language: | DE | [2022/31] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4285126 | Date: | 06.12.2023 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 04.08.2022 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2023/49] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 04.08.2022 | Classification | IPC: | G01R19/165, G01R15/04 | [2023/49] | CPC: |
G01R19/16547 (EP);
G01R15/04 (EP);
G01R23/02 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/49] | Title | German: | MESS-VORRICHTUNG ZUR DIFFERENTIELLEN SPANNUNGSMESSUNG | [2023/49] | English: | MEASUREMENT DEVICE FOR DIFFERENTIAL VOLTAGE MEASUREMENT | [2023/49] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE MESURE POUR MESURE DE TENSION DIFFÉRENTIELLE | [2023/49] | Entry into regional phase | 28.08.2023 | National basic fee paid | 28.08.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 28.08.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 28.08.2023 | Examination requested [2023/49] | 28.08.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 11.03.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.01.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US2003168995 (GRABNER MARTIN [DE], et al) [A] 1-15 * paragraph [0029] - paragraph [0034]; figure 1 *; | [I]WO2006085771 (SINTEF ENERGIFORSKNING AS [NO], et al) [I] 1-15 * page 3, line 21 - page 4, line 23; figure 3 *; | [I]JP2011064559 (HITACHI AUTOMOTIVE SYSTEMS LTD) [I] 1-15 * paragraph [0028] - paragraph [0031]; figure 3 *; | [A]JP2012002542 (HONDA MOTOR CO LTD) [A] 1-15 * paragraph [0036] - paragraph [0037]; figure 1 *; | [A]JP2015023608 (ROHM CO LTD) [A] 1-15 * paragraph [0032] - paragraph [0066]; figure 2 *; | [A]CN105870931B (ELECTRIC POWER RES INST STATE GRID JIANGSU ELECTRIC POWER CO ET AL.) [A] 1-15 * paragraph [0024] - paragraph [0027] *; | [A]US2018279413 (NOVIKOV LENNY [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * paragraph [0039] - paragraph [0042]; figure 7 *; | [A]DE102017205359 (BSH HAUSGERAETE GMBH [DE]) [A] 1-15* paragraph [0001] * |