EP4281315 - ASSEMBLY OF A VEHICLE, COMPRISING A LONGITUDINAL ADJUSTMENT OF A VEHICLE SEAT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 27.10.2023 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 29.07.2022 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 02.02.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.03.2024 | Change: Validation states | published on 24.04.2024 [2024/17] | 22.03.2024 | Change - extension states | published on 24.04.2024 [2024/17] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Brose Fahrzeugteile SE & Co. Kommanditgesellschaft, Coburg Max-Brose-Straße 1 96450 Coburg / DE | [2023/48] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KIESER-NEUMEYER, Sandra 96450 Coburg / DE | 02 /
KRÖNER, Gregor 96120 Bischberg / DE | [2023/48] | Representative(s) | Maikowski & Ninnemann Patentanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Postfach 15 09 20 10671 Berlin / DE | [2023/48] | Application number, filing date | 22700639.2 | 14.01.2022 | [2023/48] | WO2022EP50723 | Priority number, date | DE202110200454 | 19.01.2021 Original published format: DE102021200454 | [2023/48] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2022157078 | Date: | 28.07.2022 | Language: | DE | [2022/30] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4281315 | Date: | 29.11.2023 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 28.07.2022 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2023/48] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 28.07.2022 | Classification | IPC: | B60N2/06 | [2023/48] | CPC: |
B60N2/067 (EP);
B60N2/02253 (EP,US);
B60N2/0264 (EP);
B60N2/12 (US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/48] | Title | German: | FAHRZEUG-BAUGRUPPE MIT LÄNGSVERSTELLUNG EINES FAHRZEUGSITZES | [2023/48] | English: | ASSEMBLY OF A VEHICLE, COMPRISING A LONGITUDINAL ADJUSTMENT OF A VEHICLE SEAT | [2023/48] | French: | MODULE DE VÉHICULE AVEC RÉGLAGE EN LONGUEUR D'UN SIÈGE DE VÉHICULE | [2023/48] | Entry into regional phase | 21.08.2023 | National basic fee paid | 21.08.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 21.08.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 21.08.2023 | Examination requested [2023/48] | 21.08.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 28.02.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.01.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [Y]EP1571034 (KEIPER GMBH & CO KG [DE]); | [XYI]KR20100033583 (DYMOS INC [KR]); | [Y]DE112018003695T (AUTONETWORKS TECHNOLOGIES LTD [JP], et al); | [Y]US2020207241 (MOULIN ANTOINE [FR], et al); | [Y]WO2020140659 (SHANGHAI YANFENG SEATING CO LTD [CN]); | [XDYI]WO2020186259 (MAGNA SEATING INC [CA], et al) | by applicant | US5950978 | DE102015215592 | WO2020186259 |