EP4288226 - MANUFACTURING PROCESS OF SPHERICAL COMPONENTS BY HYDROFORMING, HYDROFORMING MACHINE FOR CARRYING OUT THE METHOD AND SPHERICAL COMPONENT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 10.11.2023 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 12.08.2022 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 02.02.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.04.2024 | Change: Validation states | published on 08.05.2024 [2024/19] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Unifer S.r.l. Via Maestri del Lavoro 3-5 41034 Finale Emilia (MO) / IT | [2023/50] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MARINO, Pietro 41034 Finale Emilia (MO) / IT | 02 /
MORVILLE, Andrea 41034 Finale Emilia (MO) / IT | [2023/50] | Representative(s) | Studio Torta S.p.A. Via Viotti, 9 10121 Torino / IT | [2023/50] | Application number, filing date | 22700686.3 | 21.01.2022 | [2023/50] | WO2022IB50550 | Priority number, date | IT20210002219 | 02.02.2021 Original published format: IT202100002219 | [2023/50] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2022167888 | Date: | 11.08.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/32] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4288226 | Date: | 13.12.2023 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 11.08.2022 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2023/50] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 11.08.2022 | Classification | IPC: | B21D26/033, B21D37/16, B21D53/10, B21D51/08, F16K5/06, C21D1/26 | [2023/50] | CPC: |
B21D26/033 (EP);
B21D37/16 (EP);
B21D51/08 (EP);
B21D53/10 (EP);
C21D1/26 (EP);
C21D1/30 (EP);
C21D7/12 (EP);
C21D9/08 (EP);
F16K5/0605 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/50] | Extension states | BA | 21.08.2023 | ME | 21.08.2023 | Validation states | MA | 21.08.2023 | MD | 21.08.2023 | TN | 21.08.2023 | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON KUGELFÖRMIGEN BAUTEILEN DURCH INNENHOCHDRUCKUMFORMUNG, INNENHOCHDRUCKUMFORMMASCHINE ZUR DURCHFÜHRUNG DES VERFAHRENS UND KUGELFÖRMIGES BAUTEIL | [2023/50] | English: | MANUFACTURING PROCESS OF SPHERICAL COMPONENTS BY HYDROFORMING, HYDROFORMING MACHINE FOR CARRYING OUT THE METHOD AND SPHERICAL COMPONENT | [2023/50] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION DE COMPOSANTS SPHÉRIQUES PAR HYDROFORMAGE, MACHINE D'HYDROFORMAGE POUR LA MISE EN ?UVRE DU PROCÉDÉ ET COMPOSANT SPHÉRIQUE | [2023/50] | Entry into regional phase | 21.08.2023 | National basic fee paid | 21.08.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 21.08.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 21.08.2023 | Examination requested [2023/50] | 21.08.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 12.03.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.01.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XYI]US5097689 (PIETROBON TIZIANA [IT]) [X] 16,17 * column 2, lines 21-27; figures 1-9 * * column 4, line 45 - column 7, line 12 * [Y] 2,6-9 [I] 1,3-5; | [X]GB2337012 (HUANG HUNG CHANG [TW]) [X] 10,11,13-15 * figures 1-5; claims 2, 8, 9 *; | [A]US6032501 (BIHRER OTTO [US]) [A] 1-17 * column 3, lines 11-27 * * column 4, lines 26-39 *; | [Y]JP2005081432 (TOYO VALVE CO LTD) [Y] 2 * figures 1, 2, 4, 5 *; | [X]EP1359354 (KLINGER AG [CH]) [X] 10-13* paragraph [0011]; figures 1-3; claim 2 *; | [XY]DE202007006205U (INTERFORGE KLEE GMBH [DE]) [X] 10-12,14,15 * page 4, lines 14-25; figures 1-4; claims 1, 2, 4, 5, 8, 11 * * page 7, line 26 - page 8, line 27 * [Y] 7,9; | [Y]CN100574969C (UNIV XI AN JIAOTONG) [Y] 6-8 * figures 1, 2, 4; claims 1, 2 *; | [A]WO2014126808 (CATERPILLAR INC [US]) [A] 1-17 * column 3, line 10 - column 4, line 2 * | by applicant | US5097689 | JP2005081432 | CN100574969C |