EP4314688 - FIXING DEVICE FOR REINFORCING THE JOINT OF A ROTARY HEAT EXCHANGER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 05.01.2024 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 30.09.2022 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 04.02.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.06.2024 | Change - representative | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Klingenburg GmbH Brüsseler Straße 77 45968 Gladbeck / DE | [2024/06] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KLEINDIENST, Jan 45966 Gladbeck / DE | [2024/06] | Representative(s) | Moser Götze & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Paul-Klinger-Strasse 9 45127 Essen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2024/06] | Lelgemann, Karl-Heinz Patentanwälte Spalthoff und Lelgemann Postfach 34 02 20 45074 Essen / DE | Application number, filing date | 22700844.8 | 21.01.2022 | [2024/06] | WO2022EP51316 | Priority number, date | DE202110107629 | 26.03.2021 Original published format: DE102021107629 | [2024/06] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2022199900 | Date: | 29.09.2022 | Language: | DE | [2022/39] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4314688 | Date: | 07.02.2024 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 29.09.2022 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2024/06] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 29.09.2022 | Classification | IPC: | F28D19/04, B21D11/22, B21D53/02, B21D53/04 | [2024/06] | CPC: |
F28D19/042 (EP,US);
F28D11/02 (US);
B23P15/26 (EP);
B23P19/04 (EP);
B21D53/027 (EP);
F28F2225/00 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/06] | Title | German: | FIXIERVORRICHTUNG ZUR VERFESTIGUNG DES GEFÜGES EINES ROTATIONSWÄRMETAUSCHERS | [2024/06] | English: | FIXING DEVICE FOR REINFORCING THE JOINT OF A ROTARY HEAT EXCHANGER | [2024/06] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE FIXATION PERMETTANT DE RENFORCER LE JOINT D'UN ÉCHANGEUR DE CHALEUR ROTATIF | [2024/06] | Entry into regional phase | 30.06.2023 | National basic fee paid | 30.06.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 30.06.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 30.06.2023 | Examination requested [2024/06] | 30.06.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 07.12.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.01.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]FR2086024 (MUNTERS AB CARL); | [A]US3800859 (NORBACK P); | [A]US4191241 (BRENNAN TIMOTHY E [US]); | [X]JPS5818090 (SEIBU GIKEN KK, et al); | [X]EP1138368 (NICHIAS CORP [JP]) |