EP4281420 - PHOSPHATE GLASSES WITH HIGH REFRACTIVE INDEX AND LOW DENSITY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 27.10.2023 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 29.07.2022 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 08.02.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.03.2024 | Change: Validation states | published on 01.05.2024 [2024/18] | 29.03.2024 | Change - extension states | published on 01.05.2024 [2024/18] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Corning Incorporated 1 Riverfront Plaza Corning, New York 14831 / US | [2023/48] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
AITKEN, Bruce Gardiner Corning, New York 14830 / US | 02 /
LUO, Jian Painted Post, New York 14870 / US | 03 /
MA, Lina Corning, New York 14830 / US | 04 /
PRIVEN, Alexander I Sejong-si Chungcheongnam-do 30001 / KR | [2023/48] | Representative(s) | Sturm, Christoph Patentanwälte Sturm Weilnau Franke Partnerschaft mbB Unter den Eichen 5 (Haus C-Süd) 65195 Wiesbaden / DE | [2023/48] | Application number, filing date | 22701482.6 | 07.01.2022 | [2023/48] | WO2022US11519 | Priority number, date | US202163140419P | 22.01.2021 Original published format: US 202163140419 P | [2023/48] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2022159280 | Date: | 28.07.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/30] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4281420 | Date: | 29.11.2023 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 28.07.2022 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2023/48] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 28.07.2022 | Classification | IPC: | C03C3/17, C03C3/21, C03C3/064 | [2023/48] | CPC: |
C03C3/17 (EP);
C03C3/21 (EP,US);
C03C3/064 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/48] | Title | German: | PHOSPHATGLÄSER MIT HOHEM BRECHUNGSINDEX UND NIEDRIGER DICHTE | [2023/48] | English: | PHOSPHATE GLASSES WITH HIGH REFRACTIVE INDEX AND LOW DENSITY | [2023/48] | French: | VERRES PHOSPHATÉS À INDICE DE RÉFRACTION ÉLEVÉ ET À FAIBLE DENSITÉ | [2023/48] | Entry into regional phase | 14.08.2023 | National basic fee paid | 14.08.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 14.08.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 14.08.2023 | Examination requested [2023/48] | 14.08.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 26.02.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.01.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [I]WO2020117651 (CORNING INC [US]) [I] 1-20* examples 173, 175 * | by applicant | JPH06345481 | JPH08104537 | JP2007015904 | US7531474 | US7603876 | US7638448 | JP2010083701 | JP2011057509 | WO2011086855 | US8389428 | US9834465 | US2019063958 |