EP4274824 - HETEROBICYCLIC COMPOUNDS HAVING AN UREA OR ANALOGUE AND THEIR COMPOSITIONS FOR TREATING CONDITIONS ASSOCIATED WITH STING ACTIVITY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 13.10.2023 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 15.07.2022 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 08.02.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.03.2024 | Amendment by applicant | Applicant(s) | For all designated states IFM Due, Inc. 855 Boylston Street Suite 1103 Boston, MA 02116 / US | [2023/46] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
VENKATRAMAN, Shankar Lansdale, Pennsylvania 19446 / US | 02 /
KATZ, Jason Newton, Massachusetts 02461 / US | 03 /
ROUSH, William R. Boston, Massachusetts 02116 / US | 04 /
SEIDEL, Hans Martin Concord, Massachusetts 01742 / US | [2023/46] | Representative(s) | D Young & Co LLP 3 Noble Street London EC2V 7BQ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2023/46] | D Young & Co LLP 120 Holborn London EC1N 2DY / GB | Application number, filing date | 22701486.7 | 07.01.2022 | [2023/46] | WO2022US11609 | Priority number, date | US202163135336P | 08.01.2021 Original published format: US 202163135336 P | [2023/46] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2022150585 | Date: | 14.07.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/28] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4274824 | Date: | 15.11.2023 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.07.2022 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2023/46] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 14.07.2022 | Classification | IPC: | C07D401/04, C07D401/14, C07D403/04, C07D403/14, A61K31/4155, A61K31/4439, A61K31/444, A61K31/497, A61P35/00 | [2023/46] | CPC: |
C07D403/04 (EP);
C07D403/14 (EP,US);
A61P35/00 (EP);
C07D209/40 (US);
C07D401/04 (EP);
C07D401/14 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/46] | Extension states | BA | 04.08.2023 | ME | 04.08.2023 | Validation states | KH | 04.08.2023 | MA | 04.08.2023 | MD | 04.08.2023 | TN | 04.08.2023 | Title | German: | HETEROBICYCLISCHE VERBINDUNGEN MIT EINEM HARNSTOFF ODER EINEM ANALOG UND IHRE ZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN ZUR BEHANDLUNG VON ERKRANKUNGEN IM ZUSAMMENHANG MIT STING-AKTIVITÄT | [2023/46] | English: | HETEROBICYCLIC COMPOUNDS HAVING AN UREA OR ANALOGUE AND THEIR COMPOSITIONS FOR TREATING CONDITIONS ASSOCIATED WITH STING ACTIVITY | [2023/46] | French: | COMPOSÉS HÉTÉROBICYCLIQUES AYANT UNE URÉE OU UN ANALOGUE ET LEURS COMPOSITIONS POUR LE TRAITEMENT D'ÉTATS ASSOCIÉS À UNE ACTIVITÉ DE STING | [2023/46] | Entry into regional phase | 04.08.2023 | National basic fee paid | 04.08.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 04.08.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 04.08.2023 | Examination requested [2023/46] | 04.08.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 04.03.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.12.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]WO2008154241 (ABBOTT LAB [US], et al) [X] 1-3,5-9,11,13-17,39 * N- [5 -( 1 -benzyl-5 -cyclopropyl- IH-1 ,2,3 -triazol-4-yl)- 1 H-indazol-3 -yl]-N'-ethylurea; N-benzyl-N'-[5 -( 1 -benzyl-5 -cyclopropyl- 1 H- 1 ,2,3 -triazol-4-yl)- 1 H-indazol-3 -yl]urea; N- [5.( l -benzyl- 1 H- 1 ,2,3 -triazol-4-yl)- 1 H-indazol-3 -yl]-N'-propylurea; N-[5-(l-benzyl-lH-l,2,3-triazol-4-yl)-lH-indazol-3-yl]-N'-ethylurea;; pages 13-27; examples 260, 319, 322 *; | [X]WO2008156757 (TAKEDA PHARMACEUTICAL [JP], et al) [X] 1,2,4,5,7,11 * Reference example 43 *; | [X]WO2009112275 (BAYER CROPSCIENCE AG [DE], et al) [X] 1,5-8,11,13-17 * compounds 4-47, 4-60 *; | [X]WO2011133882 (CYTOKINETICS INC [US], et al) [X] 1-3,9,11,13,14,36 * Page 188 1st compound Page 221 2nd compound *; | [X]WO2017189663 (ENANTA PHARM INC [US]) [X] 1,4,7,12,14,36 * compounds 345-350, 354, 368-373 *; | [Y]WO2020010155 (IFM DUE INC [US]) [Y] 1-39 * claims 1-15, 19-114, 116-170 *; | [Y]WO2020150417 (IFM DUE INC [US]) [Y] 1-39* claims 1-26, 30-127, 136-278 * | by applicant | US7927613 | US2012202848 | WO2015061294 | - LAMMERS et al., "Effect of Intratumoral Injection on the Biodistribution and the Therapeutic Potential of HPMA Copolymer-Based Drug Delivery Systems", Neoplasia, (20060000), vol. 10, pages 788 - 795 | - FILIPSKI, K.J. et al., Current Topics in Medicinal Chemistry, (20130000), vol. 13, pages 776 - 802 |