EP4288256 - A COMB ATTACHMENT AND A KIT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 20.06.2024 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 16.02.2024 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 10.11.2023 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 12.08.2022 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 09.02.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.06.2024 | (Expected) grant | published on 24.07.2024 [2024/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Koninklijke Philips N.V. High Tech Campus 52 5656 AG Eindhoven / NL | [2023/50] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
EIJKELKAMP, Marcus Franciscus 5656 AG Eindhoven / NL | 02 /
DE VRIES, Alwin William 5656 AG Eindhoven / NL | 03 /
PETRELLI, Marcus Cornelis 5656 AG Eindhoven / NL | 04 /
HIN, Theodoor René Maria 5656 AG Eindhoven / NL | 05 /
KINGMA, Pieter 5656 AG Eindhoven / NL | [2023/50] | Representative(s) | Philips Intellectual Property & Standards High Tech Campus 52 5656 AG Eindhoven / NL | [2023/50] | Application number, filing date | 22701621.9 | 25.01.2022 | [2023/50] | WO2022EP51559 | Priority number, date | EP20210154841 | 02.02.2021 Original published format: EP 21154841 | [2023/50] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2022167263 | Date: | 11.08.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/32] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4288256 | Date: | 13.12.2023 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 11.08.2022 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2023/50] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP4288256 | Date: | 24.07.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/30] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 11.08.2022 | Classification | IPC: | B26B19/20, B26B19/38 | [2023/50] | CPC: |
B26B19/20 (EP,CN,KR,US);
B26B19/3813 (EP,KR,US);
F16H19/04 (KR)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/50] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | KAMMAUFSATZ UND KIT | [2024/01] | English: | A COMB ATTACHMENT AND A KIT | [2023/50] | French: | FIXATION DE PEIGNE ET KIT | [2024/01] |
Former [2023/50] | KAMMBEFESTIGUNG UND KIT | ||
Former [2023/50] | ACCESSOIRE PEIGNE ET KIT | Entry into regional phase | 04.09.2023 | National basic fee paid | 04.09.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 04.09.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 04.09.2023 | Examination requested [2023/50] | 04.09.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 16.02.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.06.2024 | Fee for grant paid | 17.06.2024 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 17.06.2024 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.01.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US3041726 (HITSON PIERSON H); | [A]WO2015169553 (KONINKL PHILIPS NV [NL]); | [AD]US10307920 (SANCHEZ FELIX [US]) | by applicant | US10307920 |