20.06.2024 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 24.07.2024 [2024/30] |
18.06.2024 |
New entry: Payment of fee for grant |
|
18.06.2024 |
New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing |
|
17.06.2024 |
New entry: Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) |
|
16.02.2024 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
09.02.2024 |
Change: Validation states |
published on 13.03.2024 [2024/11] |
09.02.2024 |
Change - extension states |
published on 13.03.2024 [2024/11] |
02.02.2024 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
01.12.2023 |
Change - German title |
published on 03.01.2024 [2024/01] |
01.12.2023 |
Change - French title |
published on 03.01.2024 [2024/01] |
10.11.2023 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 13.12.2023 [2023/50] |
10.11.2023 |
The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established |
|
10.11.2023 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 13.12.2023 [2023/50] |
16.10.2023 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
05.09.2023 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
28.08.2023 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
23.08.2023 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
22.08.2023 |
Change - representative |
|
22.08.2023 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
12.08.2022 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
12.08.2022 |
New entry: applicant or inventor |
|
13.05.2022 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
09.02.2022 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|