Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2024083046 | Global Dossier | 14.03.2024 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP21154841 | 02.02.2021 | WO2022EP51559 | 25.01.2022 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR20230137430 | Global Dossier | 04.10.2023 | A | Priority number | Date | EP21154841 | 02.02.2021 | WO2022EP51559 | 25.01.2022 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP7446534B | Global Dossier | 08.03.2024 | B2 | JP2023554699 | 28.12.2023 | A | Priority number | Date | EP21154841 | 02.02.2021 | WO2022EP51559 | 25.01.2022 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP4288256 | Global Dossier | 24.07.2024 | B1 | EP4288256 | 13.12.2023 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP21154841 | 02.02.2021 | WO2022EP51559 | 25.01.2022 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | MX2023009017 | 08.08.2023 | A | Priority number | Date | EP21154841 | 02.02.2021 | WO2022EP51559 | 25.01.2022 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2022167263 | Global Dossier | 11.08.2022 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP21154841 | 02.02.2021 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP4035851 | Global Dossier | 03.08.2022 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP21154841 | 02.02.2021 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN114833874 | Global Dossier | 02.08.2022 | A | Priority number | Date | EP21154841 | 02.02.2021 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN217394999U | 09.09.2022 | U | Priority number | Date | EP21154841 | 02.02.2021 |