EP4281269 - METHOD AND APPARATUS OF A MULTIELEMENT ACOUSTIC PANNEL FOR SOUND ATTENUATION STRUCTURE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2023/48] | METHOD AND LINE FOR MANUFACTURING A PANEL WITH MULTIPLE ACOUSTIC ELEMENTS FOR AN ACOUSTIC ATTENUATION STRUCTURE | ||
[2024/25] | Status | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 06.06.2024 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 27.10.2023 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 29.07.2022 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 15.02.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.09.2024 | New entry: Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | 23.09.2024 | New entry: Payment of fee for grant | 23.09.2024 | New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SAFRAN 2, Boulevard du Général Martial Valin 75015 Paris / FR | [2023/48] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LANFANT, Nicolas Pierre 77550 MOISSY-CRAMAYEL / FR | 02 /
ALGLAVE, Hugues Laurent 77550 MOISSY-CRAMAYEL / FR | 03 /
DUNLEAVY, Patrick 77550 MOISSY-CRAMAYEL / FR | [2023/48] | Representative(s) | Cabinet Beau de Loménie 158, rue de l'Université 75340 Paris Cedex 07 / FR | [2023/48] | Application number, filing date | 22702766.1 | 13.01.2022 | [2023/48] | WO2022FR50069 | Priority number, date | FR20210000483 | 19.01.2021 Original published format: FR 2100483 | [2023/48] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2022157440 | Date: | 28.07.2022 | Language: | FR | [2022/30] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4281269 | Date: | 29.11.2023 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 28.07.2022 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2023/48] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 28.07.2022 | Classification | IPC: | B29C51/04, B29C51/00, B29C51/26, B29C51/42, B32B38/12, B29C51/22, B29D24/00, B32B3/26, B32B3/28, G10K11/172, B29K81/00, B29K79/00, B29K309/08, B29K307/04, B29K477/00, B29C51/08, B32B37/12, B32B37/04, // B29L31/00, B29L31/60, B29L9/00 | [2024/25] | CPC: |
B29C51/04 (EP,US);
B29C51/22 (EP,US);
B29C33/72 (US);
B29C35/0805 (US);
B29C43/46 (US);
B29C51/006 (EP);
B29C51/261 (EP,US);
B29C51/266 (EP);
B29C51/426 (EP,US);
B29C51/428 (EP,US);
B29C51/44 (US);
B29D24/005 (EP);
B32B27/08 (US);
B32B3/266 (EP);
B32B3/28 (EP,US);
B32B38/12 (EP);
G10K11/168 (US);
G10K11/172 (EP);
B29C2035/0822 (US);
B29C2043/463 (US);
B29C51/082 (EP);
B29K2079/085 (EP);
B29K2081/04 (EP);
B29K2081/06 (EP);
B29K2307/04 (EP);
B29K2309/08 (EP);
B29K2477/10 (EP);
B29K2871/00 (EP);
B29L2009/00 (EP);
B29L2031/60 (EP,US);
B29L2031/721 (EP);
B29L2031/7724 (EP);
B32B2307/10 (EP);
B32B2307/102 (US);
B32B2307/7376 (US);
B32B37/04 (EP);
B32B37/12 (EP)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2023/48] | B29C51/04, B29C51/00, B29C51/26, B29C51/42, B32B38/12, B29C51/22, B29D24/00, B32B3/26, B32B3/28, G10K11/172, B29K81/00, B29K79/00, B29K309/08, B29K307/04, B29K477/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/48] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINER AKUSTIKPLATTE MIT MEHREREN ELEMENTEN FÜR EINE SCHALLDÄMMUNGSSTRUKTUR | [2024/25] | English: | METHOD AND APPARATUS OF A MULTIELEMENT ACOUSTIC PANNEL FOR SOUND ATTENUATION STRUCTURE | [2024/25] | French: | PROCEDE ET CHAINE DE FABRICATION D'UN PANNEAU MULTIELEMENTS ACOUSTIQUES POUR STRUCTURE D'ATTENUATION ACOUSTIQUE | [2023/48] |
Former [2023/48] | VERFAHREN UND FERTIGUNGSLINIE ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINER PLATTE MIT MEHREREN AKUSTISCHEN ELEMENTEN FÜR EINE AKUSTISCHE DÄMPFUNGSSTRUKTUR | ||
Former [2023/48] | METHOD AND LINE FOR MANUFACTURING A PANEL WITH MULTIPLE ACOUSTIC ELEMENTS FOR AN ACOUSTIC ATTENUATION STRUCTURE | Entry into regional phase | 18.08.2023 | National basic fee paid | 18.08.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 18.08.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 18.08.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 18.08.2023 | Examination requested [2023/48] | 18.08.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 07.06.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.09.2024 | Fee for grant paid | 23.09.2024 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 23.09.2024 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.01.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]JPS60244523 (BRIDGESTONE CORP) [A] 1-26 * the whole document *; | [AD]FR3082987 (AIRBUS OPERATIONS SAS [FR]) [AD] 1-26 * page 3, line 14 - page 6, line 17; figures 1-4; claim 1 *; | [A]US2020202830 (BROSSARD DENIS [FR], et al) [A] 1-26* paragraphs [0048] - [0096]; figures 1,7-12; claims 1,9 * | by applicant | GB2314526 | US5912442 | FR3082987 |