EP4281650 - APPARATUS FOR REMOVAL OR INSTALLATION OF TURBINE BLADE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 27.10.2023 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 29.07.2022 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 15.02.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.03.2024 | Change: Validation states | published on 01.05.2024 [2024/18] | 29.03.2024 | Change - extension states | published on 01.05.2024 [2024/18] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states General Electric Technology GmbH Brown Boveri Strasse 8 5400 Baden / CH | For all designated states Atlantic Plant Maintenance, Inc. 3225 Pasadena Boulevard Pasadena, TX 77503 / US | [2023/50] |
Former [2023/48] | For all designated states General Electric Company 1 River Road Schenectady, NY 12345 / US | ||
For all designated states Atlantic Plant Maintenance, Inc. 3225 Pasadena Boulevard Pasadena, TX 77503 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
PILICHOWSKA, Joanna Sylwia 02-256 Warsaw / PL | 02 /
DZIECIOL, Piotr Krzysztof 02-256 Warsaw / PL | 03 /
PERKOWSKI, Szymon 02-256 Warsaw / PL | 04 /
MORONEY, Daniel John Swansea SA2 8AS / GB | 05 /
HENDRICKS, Eric Wayne Pasadena, Texas 77503 / US | [2023/48] | Representative(s) | Rüger Abel Patentanwälte PartGmbB Webergasse 3 73728 Esslingen a. N. / DE | [2023/48] | Application number, filing date | 22702847.9 | 17.01.2022 | [2023/48] | WO2022US70212 | Priority number, date | PL20210436737 | 22.01.2021 Original published format: PL 43673721 | US202117399370 | 11.08.2021 Original published format: US202117399370 | [2023/48] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2022159930 | Date: | 28.07.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/30] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4281650 | Date: | 29.11.2023 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 28.07.2022 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2023/48] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 28.07.2022 | Classification | IPC: | F01D5/00, B23P15/00, B23P19/033, B23P19/04, F01D5/30, F01D25/28, B23P19/02 | [2023/48] | CPC: |
F01D25/285 (EP,KR);
B23P19/025 (EP,KR);
B23P19/033 (EP,KR);
B23P19/04 (EP,KR);
F01D5/005 (EP,KR);
F01D5/3007 (EP,KR);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/48] | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG ZUR ENTFERNUNG ODER INSTALLATION EINER TURBINENSCHAUFEL | [2023/48] | English: | APPARATUS FOR REMOVAL OR INSTALLATION OF TURBINE BLADE | [2023/48] | French: | APPAREIL POUR LE RETRAIT OU L'INSTALLATION D'UNE AUBE DE TURBINE | [2023/48] | Entry into regional phase | 27.06.2023 | National basic fee paid | 27.06.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 27.06.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 31.08.2022 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 27.06.2023 | Examination requested [2023/48] | 27.06.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 13.11.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.01.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]EP1614856 (SIEMENS AG [DE]) [A] 1,8-11,16* figures 1,2; claims 1,2 *; | [A]EP2733307 (SIEMENS AG [DE]) [A] 1,8-11,16 * paragraphs [0008] , [0038] - [0050]; figure 4 *; | [XAI]EP3318716 (GEN ELECTRIC [US]) [X] 1,2,4-8,11-18 * paragraphs [0025] - [0028] - [0033] , [0039] - [0044]; figures 12,13 * [A] 9,10,19 [I] 3,20; | [XAI]EP3327250 (GEN ELECTRIC [US]) [X] 1,2,4-8,11-18 * paragraphs [0025] - [0028] - [0033] , [0040] - [0045]; figures 12,13 * [A] 9,10,19 [I] 3,20 |