EP4287894 - A METHOD FOR CONTROLLING THE HEATING OF A SUSCEPTOR OF AN AEROSOL-GENERATING DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 10.11.2023 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 12.08.2022 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 16.02.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.04.2024 | Change: Validation states | published on 15.05.2024 [2024/20] | 12.04.2024 | Change - extension states | published on 15.05.2024 [2024/20] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states JT International SA 8, rue Kazem Radjavi 1202 Geneva / CH | [2023/50] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ZIGMUND, Branislav 90606 Vrbovce / SK | 02 /
LOJEK, Stefan 01008 Zilina / SK | 03 /
VANKO, Daniel 03854 Krpelany / SK | 04 /
KONVI NÝ, Petr 756 61 Roznov p.R. / CZ | 05 /
SLIVA, Stanislav 70200 Ostrava / CZ | [2023/50] | Representative(s) | Serjeants LLP Dock 75 Exploration Drive Leicester, LE4 5NU / GB | [2023/50] | Application number, filing date | 22703001.2 | 04.02.2022 | [2023/50] | WO2022EP52771 | Priority number, date | EP20210155430 | 05.02.2021 Original published format: EP 21155430 | [2023/50] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2022167613 | Date: | 11.08.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/32] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4287894 | Date: | 13.12.2023 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 11.08.2022 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2023/50] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 11.08.2022 | Classification | IPC: | A24F40/465 | [2023/50] | CPC: |
A24F40/50 (EP,KR);
A24F40/465 (EP,KR,US);
A24F40/20 (EP,KR);
A24F40/57 (US);
H05B6/06 (EP,KR)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/50] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR STEUERUNG DER ERWÄRMUNG EINES SUSZEPTORS EINER AEROSOLERZEUGUNGSVORRICHTUNG | [2023/50] | English: | A METHOD FOR CONTROLLING THE HEATING OF A SUSCEPTOR OF AN AEROSOL-GENERATING DEVICE | [2023/50] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE COMMANDE DU CHAUFFAGE D'UN SUSCEPTEUR D'UN DISPOSITIF DE GÉNÉRATION D'AÉROSOL | [2023/50] | Entry into regional phase | 01.09.2023 | National basic fee paid | 01.09.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 01.09.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 01.09.2023 | Examination requested [2023/50] | 01.09.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 02.01.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.02.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [Y]WO2011009133 (NEKTAR THERAPEUTICS [US], et al) [Y] 2* paragraphs [0045] - [0056]; figures 2-5 *; | [XYI]WO2020043900 (NICOVENTURES TRADING LTD [GB]) [X] 1,3,4,6,7,10,12 * page 1, line 18 - page 12, line 20; figures 1,2,3 * * page 19, line 10 - page 35, line 8 * [Y] 2 [I] 5,8,9,11,13 | by applicant | WO2020020970 |