EP4340818 - PHARMACEUTICAL TABLET COMPRISING ACETYLSALICYLIC ACID [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 23.02.2024 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 26.11.2022 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 20.02.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.07.2024 | Change: Validation states | published on 28.08.2024 [2024/35] | 26.07.2024 | Change - extension states | published on 28.08.2024 [2024/35] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states G.L. Pharma GmbH Schlossplatz 1 8502 Lannach / AT | [2024/13] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LEITNER, Joachim 8502 Lannach / AT | [2024/13] | Representative(s) | SONN Patentanwälte GmbH & Co KG Riemergasse 14 1010 Wien / AT | [2024/13] | Application number, filing date | 22703640.7 | 03.02.2022 | [2024/13] | WO2022EP52606 | Priority number, date | EP20210174652 | 19.05.2021 Original published format: EP 21174652 | [2024/13] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2022242919 | Date: | 24.11.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/47] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4340818 | Date: | 27.03.2024 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 24.11.2022 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2024/13] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 24.11.2022 | Classification | IPC: | A61K9/28, A61K31/00 | [2024/13] | CPC: |
A61K9/2846 (EP);
A61K31/616 (EP);
A61K9/2893 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/13] | Title | German: | PHARMAZEUTISCHE TABLETTE ENTHALTEND ACETYLSALICYLSÄURE | [2024/13] | English: | PHARMACEUTICAL TABLET COMPRISING ACETYLSALICYLIC ACID | [2024/13] | French: | COMPRIMÉ PHARMACEUTIQUE COMPRENANT DE L'ACIDE ACÉTYLSALICYLIQUE | [2024/13] | Entry into regional phase | 09.11.2023 | National basic fee paid | 09.11.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 09.11.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 09.11.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 09.11.2023 | Examination requested [2024/13] | 09.11.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 08.02.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]AU477515B (STERLING PHARMACEUTICALS PTY. LIMITED) [X] 1,3,5,8 * embodiment 1 *; | [A]US4716042 (BLANK ROBERT G [US], et al) [A] 1-8 * example 1 *; | [XI]CN101596166B (YUNG SHIN PHARM IND KUNSHAN CO LTD) [X] 1-3,5,7,8 * page 7 * [I] 4,6; | [A]US2012015032 (KIM SUNG WUK [KR], et al) [A] 1-8 * figure 13; example 2 *; | [A] - Sims Elizabeth ET AL, "Eye on excipients", (20160401), pages 1 - 3, URL: https://tabletscapsules.com/wp-content/uploads/pdf/tc_20160301_0047.pdf, (20211101), XP055856618 [A] 1-8 * page 1; figure 1 * * page 3; figure 5 * | by applicant | US4716042 | US2012015032 | EP2785331 | EP3027176 | EP2811985 | - BRIGDEN M.SMITH R. E., Can Med Assoc J, (19970000), vol. 156, pages 1025 - 8 | - ARONOFF D. M.NEILSON E. G., Am J Med, (20010000), vol. 111, no. 4, pages 304 - 15 | - UNDAS et al., J Thromb Haemost, (20140000), vol. 12, pages 1776 - 87 |