EP4301174 - METHOD FOR CONTROLLING COMMUNICATION OF AN AEROSOL GENERATING DEVICE WITH ONE OR MORE EXTENSION UNITS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 08.12.2023 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 09.09.2022 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 20.02.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.05.2024 | Change: Validation states | published on 05.06.2024 [2024/23] | 03.05.2024 | Change - extension states | published on 05.06.2024 [2024/23] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states JT International SA 8, rue Kazem Radjavi 1202 Geneva / CH | [2024/02] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GRECO DA FONSECA DE CARVALHO, Gabriela 1225 Chêne-Bourg / CH | 02 /
SEMASHKO, Sergei Minsk, 220017 / BY | 03 /
RUSAK, Raman Minsk, 220051 / BY | [2024/02] | Representative(s) | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastraße 30 81925 München / DE | [2024/02] | Application number, filing date | 22703657.1 | 04.02.2022 | [2024/02] | WO2022EP52704 | Priority number, date | EP20210159904 | 01.03.2021 Original published format: EP 21159904 | [2024/02] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2022184377 | Date: | 09.09.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/36] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4301174 | Date: | 10.01.2024 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 09.09.2022 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2024/02] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 09.09.2022 | Classification | IPC: | A24F40/50, A24F40/65, G06F13/42 | [2024/02] | CPC: |
A24F40/50 (EP,KR,US);
A24F40/65 (EP,KR,US);
A24F40/40 (EP,KR);
A24F40/60 (KR);
A24F40/90 (KR);
G06F13/4282 (US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/02] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR STEUERUNG DER KOMMUNIKATION EINER AEROSOLERZEUGUNGSVORRICHTUNG MIT EINER ODER MEHREREN ERWEITERUNGSEINHEITEN | [2024/02] | English: | METHOD FOR CONTROLLING COMMUNICATION OF AN AEROSOL GENERATING DEVICE WITH ONE OR MORE EXTENSION UNITS | [2024/02] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE COMMANDE DE COMMUNICATION D'UN DISPOSITIF DE GÉNÉRATION D'AÉROSOL AVEC UNE OU PLUSIEURS UNITÉS D'EXTENSION | [2024/02] | Entry into regional phase | 15.09.2023 | National basic fee paid | 15.09.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 15.09.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 15.09.2023 | Examination requested [2024/02] | 15.09.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 09.04.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.02.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US2014229644 (THANIGASALAM HARAN [US], et al); | [A]WO2016023809 (PHILIP MORRIS PRODUCTS SA [CH]); | [A]US2020229499 (NIEBUHR GUNNAR [DE], et al); | [A]US2020305506 (BORKOVEC VACLAV [DE]) |