|
29.07.2024 |
Communication of amended entries concerning the representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.06.2024 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.06.2024 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.06.2024 |
Statement of non-availability of priority search results |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
29.05.2024 |
Invitation to file a copy of search results(priority) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
12.04.2024 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
12.04.2024 |
Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
12.04.2024 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
13 |
|
12.04.2024 |
Amended description filed after receipt of (European) search report |
Search / examination |
89 |
|
12.04.2024 |
Amended description with annotations |
Search / examination |
113 |
|
12.04.2024 |
Amendments received before examination |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
12.04.2024 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.12.2023 |
Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
12.10.2023 |
Communication concerning correction of deficiencies in written opinion/amendment of application/payment of claims fee |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
18.09.2023 |
Copy of the international preliminary report on patentability |
Search / examination |
10 |
|
24.08.2023 |
Republication of front page of international application with corrected bibliographic data |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
11.08.2023 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
11.08.2023 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
11.07.2023 |
Communication in cases for which no other form is applicable |
International Searching Authority |
2 |
|
26.06.2023 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
26.06.2023 |
Request for entry into the European phase |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
08.10.2022 |
Notification of the recording of a change |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
08.10.2022 |
Notification of the recording of a change |
International Searching Authority |
1 |
|
26.09.2022 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
138 |
|
09.09.2022 |
Copy of the international search report |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
09.09.2022 |
Published international application - A1 |
Search / examination |
148 |
|
29.07.2022 |
ISR: cited documents |
International Searching Authority |
4 |
|
29.07.2022 |
Written opinion of the ISA, boxes No. I to VIII |
International Searching Authority |
4 |
|
29.07.2022 |
Written opinion of the ISA, cover sheet |
International Searching Authority |
1 |
|
29.07.2022 |
Written opinion of the ISA, supplemental box |
International Searching Authority |
4 |
|
08.06.2022 |
Partial International Search Report |
International Searching Authority |
3 |
|
08.06.2022 |
Provisional opinion accompanying the partial search results |
International Searching Authority |
4 |
|
15.03.2022 |
Substitute sheet (Rule 26) - request form for ISA/EP |
International Searching Authority |
6 |
|
22.02.2022 |
Annex |
International Searching Authority |
3 |
|
22.02.2022 |
Notification of receipt of Search copy |
International Searching Authority |
1 |
|
22.02.2022 |
Notification relating to declaration under Rule 4.17 PCT (copy for ISA/EP) |
International Searching Authority |
2 |
|
01.02.2022 |
Abstract |
International Searching Authority |
1 |
|
01.02.2022 |
Annex |
International Searching Authority |
1 |
|
01.02.2022 |
Annex |
International Searching Authority |
1 |
|
01.02.2022 |
Claims |
International Searching Authority |
12 |
|
01.02.2022 |
Communication in Cases for Which No Other Form Is Applicable (copy for ISA/EP) |
International Searching Authority |
1 |
|
01.02.2022 |
Description |
International Searching Authority |
112 |
|
01.02.2022 |
Drawings |
International Searching Authority |
22 |
|
01.02.2022 |
Invitation to Correct Defects in the International Application (copy for ISA/EP) |
International Searching Authority |
4 |
|
01.02.2022 |
Request form for international application (copy for ISA/EP) |
International Searching Authority |
4 |