EP4302540 - WIRELESS NETWORK CONFIGURATION FOR LOW-LATENCY APPLICATIONS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 08.12.2023 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 09.09.2022 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 01.03.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.05.2024 | Change: Validation states | published on 12.06.2024 [2024/24] | 10.05.2024 | Change - extension states | published on 12.06.2024 [2024/24] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states QUALCOMM INCORPORATED ATTN: International IP Administration 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego, California 92121-1714 / US | [2024/02] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HUANG, Xiaolong San Diego, California 92121-1714 / US | 02 /
KATAR, Srinivas San Diego, California 92121-1714 / US | 03 /
DAVIDSON, Andrew MacKinnon San Diego, California 92121-1714 / US | 04 /
HOMCHAUDHURI, Sandip San Diego, California 92121-1714 / US | 05 /
XUE, Qi San Diego, California 92121-1714 / US | 06 /
NURANI KRISHNAN, Neelakantan San Diego, California 92121-1714 / US | 07 /
BRAND, Simon Jan San Diego, California 92121-1714 / US | [2024/02] | Representative(s) | Bardehle Pagenberg Partnerschaft mbB Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte Prinzregentenplatz 7 81675 München / DE | [2024/02] | Application number, filing date | 22705263.6 | 01.02.2022 | [2024/02] | WO2022US14747 | Priority number, date | US202117191234 | 03.03.2021 Original published format: US202117191234 | [2024/02] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2022186934 | Date: | 09.09.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/36] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4302540 | Date: | 10.01.2024 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 09.09.2022 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2024/02] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 09.09.2022 | Classification | IPC: | H04W72/04 | [2024/02] | CPC: |
H04W72/21 (EP);
H04W40/02 (KR,US);
H04W72/563 (US);
H04W52/0209 (KR);
H04W72/0446 (KR);
H04W72/0453 (KR);
H04W72/51 (EP,KR);
H04W76/10 (KR);
H04W76/15 (US);
H04W72/23 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/02] | Title | German: | DRAHTLOSE NETZWERKKONFIGURATION FÜR ANWENDUNGEN MIT NIEDRIGER LATENZ | [2024/02] | English: | WIRELESS NETWORK CONFIGURATION FOR LOW-LATENCY APPLICATIONS | [2024/02] | French: | CONFIGURATION DE RÉSEAU SANS FIL POUR DES APPLICATIONS À FAIBLE LATENCE | [2024/02] | Entry into regional phase | 12.06.2023 | National basic fee paid | 12.06.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 12.06.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 12.06.2023 | Examination requested [2024/02] | 12.06.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 27.03.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 09.02.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XA]US2018199381 (RONG LU [CN], et al) [X] 1,29,60,65 * paragraphs [0214] - [0232] *[A] 2-28,30-59,61-64; | [XI]US2019037555 (KIM MYOUNGSEOB [KR], et al) [X] 1-3,5,6,29-31,33,60,65 * paragraphs [0356] - [0392] - [0421] - [0494] * * claims 1,2 * [I] 4,7-28,32,34-59,61-64,66-69 |