EP4288225 - ULTRAFAST FLASH JOULE HEATING SYNTHESIS METHODS AND SYSTEMS FOR PERFORMING SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 10.11.2023 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 12.08.2022 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 01.03.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.04.2024 | Change: Validation states | published on 08.05.2024 [2024/19] | 05.04.2024 | Change - extension states | published on 08.05.2024 [2024/19] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states William Marsh Rice University 6100 Main Street Houston, TX 77005 / US | [2023/50] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TOUR, James M. Bellaire, Texas 77401 / US | 02 /
DENG, Bing Houston, Texas 77030 / US | [2023/50] | Representative(s) | HGF HGF Limited 1 City Walk Leeds LS11 9DX / GB | [2023/50] | Application number, filing date | 22705281.8 | 02.02.2022 | [2023/50] | WO2022US14923 | Priority number, date | US202163144862P | 02.02.2021 Original published format: US 202163144862 P | [2023/50] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2022169859 | Date: | 11.08.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/32] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4288225 | Date: | 13.12.2023 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 11.08.2022 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2023/50] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 11.08.2022 | Classification | IPC: | B09C1/08 | [2023/50] | CPC: |
B09C1/085 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/50] | Title | German: | ULTRASCHNELLE FLASH-JOULE-ERHITZUNGSSYNTHESEVERFAHREN UND SYSTEME ZUR DURCHFÜHRUNG DAVON | [2023/50] | English: | ULTRAFAST FLASH JOULE HEATING SYNTHESIS METHODS AND SYSTEMS FOR PERFORMING SAME | [2023/50] | French: | PROCÉDÉS DE SYNTHÈSE PAR CHAUFFAGE PAR EFFET JOULE FLASH ULTRARAPIDE ET SYSTÈMES POUR LEUR MISE EN OEUVRE | [2023/50] | Entry into regional phase | 24.08.2023 | National basic fee paid | 24.08.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 24.08.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 24.08.2023 | Examination requested [2023/50] | 24.08.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 08.03.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.02.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [AD]WO2020051000 (UNIV RICE WILLIAM M [US]) [AD] 1-60 * the whole document *; | [XA] - ASADOLLAHFARDI GHOLAMREZA ET AL, "Electrokinetic remediation of diesel-contaminated silty sand under continuous and periodic voltage application", ENVIRONMENTAL ENGINEERING RESEARCH, vol. 24, no. 3, doi:10.4491/eer.2018.301, ISSN 1226-1025, (20190928), pages 456 - 462, URL: https://www.koreascience.or.kr/article/JAKO201928462662249.pdf, XP055918478 [X] 1-4,6,7,9,34-43,49,52,53 * paragraph [0004] * [A] 5,8,10-33,44-48,50,51,54-60 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.4491/eer.2018.301 | [AD] - BARBHUIYA, N. H. ET AL., "The future of flash graphene for the sustainable management of solid waste", ACS NANO, (2021), vol. 15, pages 15461 - 15470, XP002806388 [AD] 1-60 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/acsnano.1c07571 | by applicant | WO2020051000 | - CALIFORNIA OFFICE OF ENVIRONMENTAL HEALTH HAZARD ASSESSMENT, California human health screening levels, (20100000), URL: https://oehha.ca.gov/chhsltable/ | - NEW JERSEY DEPARTMENT OF ENVIRONMENTAL PROTECTION, Estimated remediation costs, (20220000), URL: https://www.nj.gov/dep/special/hpctf/final/costs.html | - UNIVERSAL MATTER, LTD, Universal Matter, Ltd, is commercially scaling up the FJH process, (20220000), URL: https://www.universalmatter.com | - "Per- and polyfluoroalkyl substances", Wikipedia, (20220000), URL: https:llen.wikzpedia.orglwikilPer-andpolyfluoroalkylsubstances | - ADVINCULA, P. A. et al., "Flash graphene from rubber waste", Carbon, (20210000), vol. 178, doi:10.1016/j.carbon.2021.03.020, pages 649 - 656, XP086566392 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.carbon.2021.03.020 | - ALGOZEEB, W. A. et al., "Flash graphene from plastic waste", ACS Nano, (20200000), vol. 14, pages 15595 - 15604 | - BARBHUIYA, N. H. et al., "The future of flash graphene for the sustainable management of solid waste", ACS Nano, (20210000), vol. 15, pages 15461 - 15470 | - BOLAN, N. et al., "Remediation of heavy metal(loid)s contaminated soils - To mobilize or to immobilize?", J. Hazard. Mater., (20140000), vol. 266, doi:10.1016/j.jhazmat.2013.12.018, pages 141 - 166, XP055576806 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.jhazmat.2013.12.018 | - CHEKOL, T. et al., "Phytoremediation of polychlorinated biphenyl-contaminated soils: the rhizosphere effect", Environ. Int., (20040000), vol. 30, pages 799 - 804 | - CHEN, W. et al., "Millisecond conversion of metastable 2D materials by flash Joule heating", ACS Nano, (20210000), vol. 15, pages 1282 - 1290 | - CHEN, W., "Ultrafast and Controllable Phase Evolution by Flash Joule Heating", ACS Nano, (20210000), vol. 15, pages 11158 - 11167 | - CHEN, W. et al., "Foreword for the special section on AC and DC ultra high voltage technologies", CSEE J Power Energy Syst, (20150000), vol. 1, pages 1 - 2 | - DENG, B. et al., "Phase controlled synthesis of transition metal carbide nanocrystals by ultrafast flash Joule heating", Nat. Commun., (20220000), vol. 13, page 262 | - DENG, B. et al., "Rare earth elements from waste", Sci. Adv., (20220000), vol. 8, page eabm3132 | - DENG, B. et al., "Urban mining by flash Joule heating", Nat. Commun., (20210000), vol. 12, page 5794 | - DERMONT, G. et al., "Soil washing for metal removal: A review of physical/chemical technologies and field applications", J. Hazard. Mater., (20080000), vol. 152, doi:10.1016/j.jhazmat.2007.10.043, pages 1 - 31, XP022508133 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.jhazmat.2007.10.043 | - DONG, Z.-Y. et al., "Remediation of soil co-contaminated with petroleum and heavy metals by the integration of electrokinetics and biostimulation", J. Hazard. Mater., (20130000), vol. 260, doi:10.1016/j.jhazmat.2013.05.003, pages 399 - 408, XP028693728 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.jhazmat.2013.05.003 | - EHLERS, L. J. et al., "Contaminant Bioavailability In Soil And Sediment", Environ Sci Technol, (20030000), vol. 37, no. 15, pages 295a - 302a | - GALVEZ, M. E. et al., "Graphite formation by carbonate reduction during subduction", Nat. Geosci., (20130000), vol. 6, pages 473 - 477 | - GAN, S. et al., "Remediation Of Soils Contaminated With Polycyclic Aromatic Hydrocarbons (PAHs", JHazardMater, (20090000), vol. 172, no. 2-3, doi:10.1016/j.jhazmat.2009.07.118, pages 532 - 549, XP026719883 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.jhazmat.2009.07.118 | - GIGER, W. et al., "Polycyclic aromatic hydrocarbons in the environment. Isolation and characterization by chromatography, visible, ultraviolet, and mass spectrometry", Anal. Chem., (19740000), vol. 46, pages 1663 - 1671 | - GUO, B. et al., "Health risk assessment of heavy metal pollution in a soil-rice system: a case study in the Jin-Qu Basin of China", Sci. Rep., (20200000), vol. 10, page 11490 | - GUO, G. et al., "Availability and assessment of fixing additives for the in Situ remediation of heavy metal contaminated soils: A review", Environ. Monit. Assess., (20060000), vol. 116, doi:10.1007/s10661-006-7668-4, pages 513 - 528, XP019395201 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/s10661-006-7668-4 | - GRIFFITHS, R. A., "Soil-Washing Technology and Practice", JHazardMater, (19950000), vol. 40, no. 2, pages 175 - 189 | - HOU, D. et al., "Metal contamination and bioremediation of agricultural soils for food safety and sustainability", Nat. Rev. Earth Environ, (20200000), vol. 1, pages 366 - 381 | - HOUDE M et al., "Biological monitoring of polyfluoroalkyl substances: A review", Environmental Science & Technology, (20060000), vol. 40, no. 11, pages 3463 - 73 | - HUSSAR, E. et al., "Human health risk assessment of 16 priority polycyclic aromatic hydrocarbons in soils of Chattanooga, Tennessee, USA", Water Air Soil Pollut, (20120000), vol. 223, doi:10.1007/s11270-012-1265-7, pages 5535 - 5548, XP035132701 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/s11270-012-1265-7 | - KINGSTON, J. L. T. et al., "Assessment of Groundwater Quality Improvements and Mass Discharge Reductions at Five In Situ Electrical Resistance Heating Remediation Sites", Ground Water Monit R, (20120000), vol. 32, no. 3, pages 41 - 51 | - LESTAN, D. et al., "The use of chelating agents in the remediation of metal-contaminated soils: A review", Environ. Pollut., (20080000), vol. 153, doi:10.1016/j.envpol.2007.11.015, pages 3 - 13, XP022612969 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.envpol.2007.11.015 | - LIU, C. et al., "Air-assisted transient synthesis of metastable nickel oxide boosting alkaline fuel oxidation reaction", Adv. Mater., (20200000), vol. 10, page 2001397 | - LIU, J. et al., "The negative interaction between the degradation of phenanthrene and tricyclazole in medium, soil and soil/compost mixture", Biodegradation, (20080000), vol. 19, pages 695 - 703, XP019600243 | - LIU, S. et al., "Extreme environmental thermal shock induced dislocation-rich Pt nanoparticles boosting hydrogen evolution reaction", Adv. Mater., (20220000), vol. 34, page 2106973 | - LIU, S. et al., "Dislocation-strained IrNi alloy nanoparticles driven by thermal shock for the hydrogen evolution reaction", Adv. Mater., (20200000), vol. 32, page 2006034 | - LIU, Y. et al., "A new strategy using nanoscale zero-valent iron to simultaneously promote remediation and safe crop production in contaminated soil", Nat. Nanotechnol., (20210000), vol. 16, doi:10.1038/s41565-020-00803-1, pages 197 - 205, XP037364601 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/s41565-020-00803-1 | - LUONG, D. X. et al., "Gram-scale bottom-up flash graphene synthesis", Nature, (20200000), vol. 577, doi:10.1038/s41586-020-1938-0, pages 647 - 651, XP037000663 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/s41586-020-1938-0 | - MA, J. W. et al., "Simultaneous removal of 2,4-dichlorophenol and Cd from soils by electrokinetic remediation combined with activated bamboo charcoal", J. Hazard. Mater., (20100000), vol. 176, doi:10.1016/j.jhazmat.2009.11.093, pages 715 - 720, XP027075406 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.jhazmat.2009.11.093 | - MUELLER, N. D. et al., "Closing Yield Gaps Through Nutrient And Water Management", Nature, (20120000), vol. 490, no. 7419, pages 254 - 257 | - MULLIGAN, C. N. et al., "Surfactant-enhanced remediation of contaminated soil: a review", Eng. Geol., (20010000), vol. 60, doi:10.1016/S0013-7952(00)00117-4, pages 371 - 380, XP004320489 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0013-7952(00)00117-4 | - RUHL, L. et al., "Survey Of The Potential Environmental And Health Impacts In The Immediate Aftermath Of The Coal Ash Spill In Kingston, Tennessee", Environ Sci Technol, (20090000), vol. 43, no. 16, pages 6326 - 633 | - SALT, D. E. et al., "Phytoremediation: A novel strategy for the removal of toxic metals from the environment using plants", BiolTechnology, (19950000), vol. 13, doi:10.1038/nbt0595-468, pages 468 - 474, XP000577130 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/nbt0595-468 | - STANFORD, M. G. et al., "Flash graphene morphologies", ACS Nano, (20200000), vol. 14, pages 13691 - 13699 | - STARY, V. R. et al., "Bio-compatibility of the surface layer of pyrolytic graphite", Thin Solid Films, (20030000), vol. 433, doi:10.1016/S0040-6090(03)00309-2, pages 191 - 198, XP004428739 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0040-6090(03)00309-2 | - STRECHE, C. et al., "Decontamination of petroleum-contaminated soils using the electrochemical technique: remediation degree and energy consumption", Sci. Rep., (20180000), vol. 8, page 3272 | - TRIPATHI, V. et al., "Sustainable clean-up technologies for soils contaminated with multiple pollutants: Plant-microbe-pollutant and climate nexus", Ecol. Eng., (20150000), vol. 82, pages 330 - 335 | - VIDALI, M., "Bioremediation. An overview", Pure Appl Chem, (20010000), vol. 73, no. 7, pages 1163 - 1172 | - WANG, C. W. et al., "A general method to synthesize and sinter bulk ceramics in seconds", Science, (20200000), vol. 368, doi:10.1126/science.aaz7681, pages 521 - 526, XP055879576 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1126/science.aaz7681 | - WEN, T. et al., "3-MV compact very fast transient overvoltage generator for testing ultra-high-voltage gas-insulated switchgear", IEEE Electr. Insul. Mag., (20140000), vol. 30, doi:10.1109/MEI.2014.6943431, pages 26 - 33, XP011563433 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/MEI.2014.6943431 | - WILLIAMS, P. N. et al., "Occurrence and Partitioning of Cadmium, Arsenic and Lead in Mine Impacted Paddy Rice: Hunan, China", Environ Sci Technol, (20090000), vol. 43, no. 3, pages 637 - 642 | - WUANA, R. A. et al., "Heavy metals in contaminated soils: A review of sources, chemistry, risks and best available strategies for remediation", ISRNEcol, (20110000), vol. 2011, page 402647 | - WYSS, K. M. et al., "Converting plastic waste pyrolysis ash into flash graphene", Carbon, (20210000), vol. 174, pages 430 - 43 | - XU, J. et al., "Remediation of heavy metal contaminated soil by asymmetrical alternating current electrochemistry", Nat. Commun., (20190000), vol. 10, page 2440 | - YAO, Y. G. et al., "Carbothermal shock synthesis of high-entropy-alloy nanoparticles", Science, (20180000), vol. 359, doi:10.1126/science.aan5412, pages 1489 - 1494, XP055724132 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1126/science.aan5412 | - YE, S. et al., "Biological technologies for the remediation of co-contaminated soil", Crit. Rev. Biotechnol., (20170000), vol. 37, pages 1062 - 1076 | - ZHANG, H. et al., "Non-thermal plasma technology for organic contaminated soil remediation: A review", Chem. Eng. J., (20170000), vol. 313, doi:10.1016/j.cej.2016.12.067, pages 157 - 170, XP029900758 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.cej.2016.12.067 | - ZHANG, J. et al., "Immediate remediation of heavy metal (Cr(VI)) contaminated soil by high energy electron beam irradiation", J. Hazard. Mater., (20150000), vol. 285, doi:10.1016/j.jhazmat.2014.11.007, pages 208 - 211, XP029136470 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.jhazmat.2014.11.007 | - ZHANG, S. et al., "Uptake and translocation of polycyclic aromatic hydrocarbons (PAHs) and heavy metals by maize from soil irrigated with wastewater", Sci. Rep., (20170000), vol. 7, page 12165 | - ZHAO, C. et al., "Thermal desorption for remediation of contaminated soil: A review", Chemosphere, (20190000), vol. 221, pages 841 - 855 | - ZHOU, Z. et al., "Persulfate-based advanced oxidation processes (AOPs) for organic-contaminated soil remediation: A review", Chem. Eng. J., (20190000), vol. 372, doi:10.1016/j.cej.2019.04.213, pages 836 - 851, XP085695804 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.cej.2019.04.213 | WO2021US52030 | WO2021US52043 | WO2021US52057 | WO2021US52070 |