EP4288194 - APPARATUS FOR MIXING IN CATALYTIC CRACKER REACTOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 10.11.2023 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 12.08.2022 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 04.03.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.04.2024 | Change: Validation states | published on 15.05.2024 [2024/20] | 12.04.2024 | Change - extension states | published on 15.05.2024 [2024/20] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Shell Internationale Research Maatschappij B.V. Carel van Bylandtlaan 30 2596 HR The Hague / NL | [2023/50] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LUDOLPH, Robert Alexander Houston, Texas 77082-3101 / US | 02 /
BASDEN, Michael Allen Deer Park, Texas 77536 / US | [2023/50] | Representative(s) | Shell Legal Services IP PO Box 384 2501 CJ The Hague / NL | [2023/50] | Application number, filing date | 22705631.4 | 01.02.2022 | [2023/50] | WO2022US14687 | Priority number, date | US202163146422P | 05.02.2021 Original published format: US 202163146422 P | [2023/50] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2022169739 | Date: | 11.08.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/32] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4288194 | Date: | 13.12.2023 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 11.08.2022 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2023/50] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 11.08.2022 | Classification | IPC: | B01J8/00, B01J8/18, B01J8/20, C10G11/18, B01J8/38, B01F23/50 | [2023/50] | CPC: |
B01J8/0025 (EP,US);
B01J8/388 (EP,US);
B01F25/3141 (EP,US);
B01F25/31423 (EP,US);
B01F25/31434 (EP);
B01F25/4318 (EP,US);
B01F25/431971 (EP,US);
B01J8/1854 (EP,US);
B01J8/1872 (EP,US);
B01J8/20 (EP,US);
C10G11/18 (EP,US);
B01F2101/2204 (US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/50] | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG ZUM MISCHEN IN EINEM KATALYTISCHEN CRACKERREAKTOR | [2023/50] | English: | APPARATUS FOR MIXING IN CATALYTIC CRACKER REACTOR | [2023/50] | French: | APPAREIL DE MÉLANGE DANS UN RÉACTEUR DE CRAQUEUR CATALYTIQUE | [2023/50] | Entry into regional phase | 02.08.2023 | National basic fee paid | 02.08.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 02.08.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 02.08.2023 | Examination requested [2023/50] | 02.08.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 20.03.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.12.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XI]EP0482055 (EXXON RESEARCH ENGINEERING CO [US]) [X] 1,5,6 * figures 1, 3 * [I] 3; | [I]US5552119 (HOLMES PHILIP [GB]) [I] 1,3,5,6 * figure 1 *; | [A]US6126813 (FERSING MARC [FR], et al) [A] 1-7* the whole document *; | [XI]US6613290 (SENIOR RICHARD C [US]) [X] 1,5-7 * column 1 * [I] 4; | [A]US2007261992 (ROUX ROMAIN [FR], et al) [A] 1-7 * the whole document *; | [XI]US7964157 (DRIES HUBERTUS WILHELMUS ALBERTUS [NL], et al) [X] 1,2,5,6 * column 4, line 18 - line 20; figures 1, 3 * [I] 3 | by applicant | US3654140 | US4479870 | US4832825 | US5173175 | US5554341 | US7101474 | US9283532 | WO2017003991 |