EP4278849 - SYSTEMS AND METHODS FOR UE CONTEXT RETRIEVAL AND DATA FORWARDING TO SUPPORT SMALL DATA TRANSMISSION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 05.04.2024 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 19.01.2024 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 20.10.2023 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 22.07.2022 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 05.03.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.04.2024 | (Expected) grant | published on 08.05.2024 [2024/19] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Telefonaktiebolaget LM Ericsson (publ) 164 83 Stockholm / SE | [2023/47] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
QIU, Liwei 183 38 Täby / SE | 02 /
LYAZIDI, Yazid 16552 Hässelby / SE | 03 /
TIRRONEN, Tuomas 00950 Helsinki / FI | 04 /
ENBUSKE, Henrik 113 41 Stockholm / SE | 05 /
CHRISTOFFERSSON, Jan 975 61 Luleå / SE | [2023/47] | Representative(s) | Ericsson Patent Development Torshamnsgatan 21-23 164 80 Stockholm / SE | [2023/47] | Application number, filing date | 22705916.9 | 11.01.2022 | [2023/47] | WO2022SE50012 | Priority number, date | US202163137456P | 14.01.2021 Original published format: US 202163137456 P | [2023/47] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2022154718 | Date: | 21.07.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/29] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4278849 | Date: | 22.11.2023 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.07.2022 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2023/47] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP4278849 | Date: | 08.05.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/19] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 21.07.2022 | Classification | IPC: | H04W8/00, H04W36/00, H04W76/27 | [2024/04] | CPC: |
H04W76/27 (EP,US);
H04W8/00 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2023/47] | H04W76/27, H04W36/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/47] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SYSTEME UND VERFAHREN FÜR BENUTZERGERÄTEKONTEXTABRUF UND DATENWEITERLEITUNG ZUR UNTERSTÜTZUNG KLEINER DATENÜBERTRAGUNG | [2023/47] | English: | SYSTEMS AND METHODS FOR UE CONTEXT RETRIEVAL AND DATA FORWARDING TO SUPPORT SMALL DATA TRANSMISSION | [2023/47] | French: | SYSTÈMES ET PROCÉDÉS DE RÉCUPÉRATION DE CONTEXTE D'UE ET DE TRANSFERT DE DONNÉES POUR PRENDRE EN CHARGE UNE TRANSMISSION DE PETITES DONNÉES | [2023/47] | Entry into regional phase | 30.05.2023 | National basic fee paid | 30.05.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 30.05.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 10.10.2022 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 30.05.2023 | Examination requested [2023/47] | 30.05.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 29.01.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.04.2024 | Fee for grant paid | 02.04.2024 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 02.04.2024 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.01.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XAYI]US2020037210 (RUGELAND PATRIK [SE], et al) [X] 1,2,8-14,22-24,31-34,40-47 * page 21, line 19 - line 27 * * page 22, line 11 - line 22 * * page 25, line 5 - line 9 * * figures 13-15 * [A] 15-21,35-39 [Y] 6,28 [I] 3-5,7,25-27,29,30; | [XAI]WO2020189958 (LG ELECTRONICS INC [KR]) [X] 1,2,8-14,22-24,30-34,40-47 * paragraph [0125] - paragraph [0126] * * figures 10b, 12a * [A] 3,4,6,18-21,28,37-39 [I] 5,7,15-17,25-27,29,35,36; | [Y] - NEC, "Subsequent data transmission for SDT", vol. RAN WG2, no. electronic; 20201102 - 20201113, (20201023), 3GPP DRAFT; R2-2009657, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, URL: https://ftp.3gpp.org/tsg_ran/WG2_RL2/TSGR2_112-e/Docs/R2-2009657.zip R2-2009657 Subsequent data transmission for SDT.docx, (20201023), XP051942573 [Y] 6,28 * Proposals 1 and 2 * |