Extract from the Register of European Patents
EP Event history: EP4274746
Date |
Description |
European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
12.07.2024 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 14.08.2024 [2024/33] |
05.07.2024 |
New entry: Payment of fee for grant |
|
05.07.2024 |
New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing |
|
04.07.2024 |
New entry: Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) |
|
06.05.2024 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
08.03.2024 |
Change: Validation states |
published on 10.04.2024 [2024/15] |
08.03.2024 |
Change - extension states |
published on 10.04.2024 [2024/15] |
16.02.2024 |
Amendment by applicant |
|
26.01.2024 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
17.10.2023 |
Change - representative |
|
13.10.2023 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 15.11.2023 [2023/46] |
13.10.2023 |
The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established |
|
13.10.2023 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 15.11.2023 [2023/46] |
18.09.2023 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
08.08.2023 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
19.06.2023 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
16.06.2023 |
Change - representative |
|
16.06.2023 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
22.07.2022 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
15.07.2022 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
15.07.2022 |
New entry: applicant or inventor |
|
07.03.2022 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|