EP4274746 - TYRE COMPRISING A BRACING PLY HAVING A HYDROPHOBIC WEFT AND A REDUCED CROWN THICKNESS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 12.07.2024 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 06.05.2024 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 13.10.2023 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 15.07.2022 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 07.03.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.07.2024 | (Expected) grant | published on 14.08.2024 [2024/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states COMPAGNIE GENERALE DES ETABLISSEMENTS MICHELIN 23 place des Carmes-Déchaux 63000 Clermont-Ferrand / FR | [2023/46] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DELBAST, Arnaud 63040 Clermont-Ferrand Cedex 9 / FR | 02 /
GALLARD, Laure 63040 Clermont-Ferrand Cedex 9 / FR | 03 /
BONNAMAIN, Pascal 63040 Clermont-Ferrand Cedex 9 / FR | [2023/46] | Representative(s) | M.F.P. Michelin DCJ/PI - F35 - Ladoux 23 place des Carmes-Déchaux 63040 Clermont-Ferrand Cedex 9 / FR | [2024/33] |
Former [2023/46] | Desbordes, Guillaume Manufacture Française des Pneumatiques Michelin 23, place des Carmes-Déchaux DCJ/PI - F35 - Ladoux 63040 Clermont-Ferrand Cedex 9 / FR | Application number, filing date | 22706067.0 | 03.01.2022 | [2023/46] | WO2022FR50002 | Priority number, date | FR20210000144 | 07.01.2021 Original published format: FR 2100144 | [2023/46] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2022148921 | Date: | 14.07.2022 | Language: | FR | [2022/28] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4274746 | Date: | 15.11.2023 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.07.2022 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2023/46] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP4274746 | Date: | 14.08.2024 | Language: | FR | [2024/33] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 14.07.2022 | Classification | IPC: | B60C9/00, B60C9/18, B60C9/22, B60C9/20, B60C11/03 | [2023/46] | CPC: |
B60C9/0042 (EP,KR);
B60C9/22 (EP,KR);
B60C9/0007 (EP,KR);
B60C9/0064 (EP,KR);
B60C9/1807 (EP,KR);
B60C9/1821 (EP,KR);
B60C9/20 (EP);
B60C2009/0035 (EP,KR);
B60C2009/2214 (EP,KR);
B60C2011/0341 (EP,KR)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/46] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | REIFEN MIT EINER VERSTÄRKUNGSLAGE MIT EINEM HYDROPHOBEN SCHUSS UND EINER REDUZIERTEN KRONENDICKE | [2023/46] | English: | TYRE COMPRISING A BRACING PLY HAVING A HYDROPHOBIC WEFT AND A REDUCED CROWN THICKNESS | [2023/46] | French: | PNEUMATIQUE COMPRENANT UNE COUCHE DE FRETTAGE A TRAME HYDROPHOBE ET A SOMMET D'ÉPAISSEUR RÉDUITE | [2023/46] | Entry into regional phase | 07.08.2023 | National basic fee paid | 07.08.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 07.08.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 07.08.2023 | Examination requested [2023/46] | 07.08.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 15.02.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 07.05.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.07.2024 | Fee for grant paid | 03.07.2024 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 03.07.2024 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.01.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]JP2013043612 (YOKOHAMA RUBBER CO LTD); | [A]US2016167438 (PETITJEAN SYLVAIN [FR], et al); | [A]FR3094272 (MICHELIN & CIE [FR]); | [A]KR102182544B (HANKOOK TIRE & TECH CO LTD [KR]) | by applicant | FR1413102 | FR2797213 | WO2015016791 | EP3489035 |