EP4278584 - METHODS AND NETWORK NODES FOR HANDLING COMMUNICATION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 12.07.2024 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 20.10.2023 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 22.07.2022 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 07.03.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.07.2024 | New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Telefonaktiebolaget LM Ericsson (publ) 164 83 Stockholm / SE | [2023/47] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BELLESCHI, Marco 171 55 Solna / SE | 02 /
MUHAMMAD, Ajmal 191 41 Sollentuna / SE | 03 /
ERIKSSON, Per-Erik 116 37 Stockholm / SE | 04 /
BERGSTRÖM, Mattias 19270 Sollentuna / SE | [2023/47] | Representative(s) | Ericsson Patent Development Torshamnsgatan 21-23 164 80 Stockholm / SE | [2023/47] | Application number, filing date | 22706133.0 | 13.01.2022 | [2023/47] | WO2022SE50028 | Priority number, date | US202163137176P | 14.01.2021 Original published format: US 202163137176 P | [2023/47] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2022154728 | Date: | 21.07.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/29] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4278584 | Date: | 22.11.2023 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.07.2022 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2023/47] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 21.07.2022 | Classification | IPC: | H04L45/28, H04W40/22 | [2023/47] | CPC: |
H04W40/22 (EP,US);
H04L45/28 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/47] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND NETZWERKKNOTEN ZUR HANDHABUNG VON KOMMUNIKATION | [2023/47] | English: | METHODS AND NETWORK NODES FOR HANDLING COMMUNICATION | [2023/47] | French: | PROCÉDÉS ET NOEUDS DE RÉSEAU POUR GÉRER UNE COMMUNICATION | [2023/47] | Entry into regional phase | 14.06.2023 | National basic fee paid | 14.06.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 14.06.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 14.06.2023 | Examination requested [2023/47] | 14.06.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 22.02.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 12.07.2024 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.01.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. |