Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP Patent family: EP4278290 Family dossiers alerts: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):  

CN202280015223 CN202410187457 CN202411299465 EP22706466 JP2023548911 KR20237027735 KR20257004606 KR20257004609 US202117177159 US2022015608W

More

US202318144947 US202418603103



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated





TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US2024223569Global Dossier 04.07.2024A1
Priority number Date
US202418603103 12.03.2024
US202318144947 09.05.2023
US202117177159 16.02.2021
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US11962599Global Dossier 16.04.2024B2
US2023336561 19.10.2023A1
Priority number Date
US202318144947 09.05.2023
US202117177159 16.02.2021
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
KR20250024137Global Dossier 18.02.2025A
Priority number Date
WO2022US15608 08.02.2022
KR20237027735 08.02.2022
US202117177159 16.02.2021
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
KR20250024136Global Dossier 18.02.2025A
Priority number Date
WO2022US15608 08.02.2022
KR20237027735 08.02.2022
US202117177159 16.02.2021
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
KR20230146534Global Dossier 19.10.2023A
Priority number Date
WO2022US15608 08.02.2022
US202117177159 16.02.2021
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
JP2024509739Global Dossier 05.03.2024A
Priority number Date
WO2022US15608 08.02.2022
US202117177159 16.02.2021
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
CN119166288Global Dossier 20.12.2024A
Priority number Date
CN202280015223 08.02.2022
WO2022US15608 08.02.2022
US202117177159 16.02.2021
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
CN118012572Global Dossier 10.05.2024A
Priority number Date
CN202280015223 08.02.2022
WO2022US15608 08.02.2022
US202117177159 16.02.2021
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
CN116848528BGlobal Dossier 01.10.2024B
CN116848528 03.10.2023A
Priority number Date
WO2022US15608 08.02.2022
US202117177159 16.02.2021
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
EP4278290Global Dossier 22.11.2023A1
Priority number Date
WO2022US15608 08.02.2022
US202117177159 16.02.2021
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
WO2022177776Global Dossier 25.08.2022A1
Priority number Date
US202117177159 16.02.2021
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
US11695776Global Dossier 04.07.2023B2
US2022263835 18.08.2022A1
Priority number Date
US202117177159 16.02.2021