EP4307969 - CAPSULE-HOLDER DEVICE FOR BEVERAGE PREPARATION MACHINES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 22.12.2023 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 23.09.2022 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 09.03.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.08.2024 | Change - representative | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Luigi Lavazza S.p.A. Via Bologna 32 10152 Torino / IT | [2024/04] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
COCCO, Alessandro 10152 Torino / IT | [2024/04] | Representative(s) | Buzzi, Notaro & Antonielli d'Oulx S.p.A. Corso Vittorio Emanuele II, 6 10123 Torino / IT | [N/P] |
Former [2024/04] | Gallarotti, Franco Buzzi, Notaro & Antonielli d'Oulx S.p.A. Corso Vittorio Emanuele ll, 6 10123 Torino / IT | Application number, filing date | 22706682.6 | 21.02.2022 | [2024/04] | WO2022IB51511 | Priority number, date | IT20210006398 | 17.03.2021 Original published format: IT202100006398 | [2024/04] | Filing language | IT | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2022195376 | Date: | 22.09.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/38] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4307969 | Date: | 24.01.2024 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.09.2022 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2024/04] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 22.09.2022 | Classification | IPC: | A47J31/06, A47J31/36, A47J31/44 | [2024/04] | CPC: |
A47J31/0642 (EP);
A47J31/0673 (EP,US);
A47J31/0678 (EP,US);
A47J31/0684 (US);
A47J31/3695 (EP,US);
A47J31/4464 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/04] | Title | German: | KAPSELHALTEVORRICHTUNG FÜR GETRÄNKEZUBEREITUNGSMASCHINEN | [2024/04] | English: | CAPSULE-HOLDER DEVICE FOR BEVERAGE PREPARATION MACHINES | [2024/04] | French: | DISPOSITIF PORTE-CAPSULE POUR MACHINES DE PRÉPARATION DE BOISSONS | [2024/04] | Entry into regional phase | 12.07.2023 | National basic fee paid | 12.07.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 12.07.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 12.07.2023 | Examination requested [2024/04] | 12.07.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 24.04.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 01.02.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XAY]US5762987 (FOND OLIVIER [CH], et al); | [A]EP2090204 (CMA SPA [IT]); | [XAYI]CN201469004U (WEI DU) |