EP4291462 - CHILD TRANSPORT DEVICE SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 17.11.2023 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 19.08.2022 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 11.03.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.04.2024 | Change: Validation states | published on 22.05.2024 [2024/21] | 19.04.2024 | Change - extension states | published on 22.05.2024 [2024/21] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CYBEX GmbH Riedinger Strasse 18 95448 Bayreuth / DE | [2023/51] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ZURWESTEN, Johannes 95448 Bayreuth / DE | 02 /
HOLLEIS, Ralf 95448 Bayreuth / DE | [2023/51] | Representative(s) | Meissner Bolte Partnerschaft mbB Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte Postfach 86 06 24 81633 München / DE | [2023/51] | Application number, filing date | 22706783.2 | 15.02.2022 | [2023/51] | WO2022EP53607 | Priority number, date | DE202120100743U | 15.02.2021 Original published format: DE 202021100743 U | [2023/51] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2022171888 | Date: | 18.08.2022 | Language: | DE | [2022/33] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4291462 | Date: | 20.12.2023 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 18.08.2022 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2023/51] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 18.08.2022 | Classification | IPC: | B62B7/04, B62B7/12, B62B19/04, B62K27/00, B62B5/00 | [2023/51] | CPC: |
B62B7/126 (EP,US);
B62B19/04 (EP,US);
B62B7/046 (EP);
B62B7/12 (EP);
B62K27/003 (EP,US);
B62K27/12 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/51] | Title | German: | KINDERTRANSPORTEINRICHTUNGS-SYSTEM | [2023/51] | English: | CHILD TRANSPORT DEVICE SYSTEM | [2023/51] | French: | SYSTÈME DE DISPOSITIF DE TRANSPORT D'ENFANT | [2023/51] | Entry into regional phase | 14.08.2023 | National basic fee paid | 14.08.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 14.08.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 14.08.2023 | Examination requested [2023/51] | 14.08.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 02.04.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.02.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]US5454577 (BELL ROBERT [CA]); | [X]DE102005029448 (FEY GEORG [DE], et al); | [X]EP2719604 (THULE CHILD TRANSP SYSTEMS LTD [CA]); | [X]US2017274919 (SOMERSET DARREN W [US], et al) | by applicant | CA2208809 | US8262103 |