EP4294905 - LAUNDRY COMPOSITION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 24.11.2023 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 26.08.2022 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 14.03.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.04.2024 | Change: Validation states | published on 29.05.2024 [2024/22] | 27.04.2024 | Change - extension states | published on 29.05.2024 [2024/22] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Reckitt Benckiser Vanish B.V. Siriusdreef 14 2132 WT Hoofddorp / NL | [2023/52] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DEL MONACO, Anna 30034 Mira / IT | 02 /
D'ISEPPI, Andrea 30034 Mira / IT | 03 /
GRANCI, Elena 30034 Mira / IT | 04 /
LOPEZ, Monica 30034 Mira / IT | 05 /
QUAGGIA, Sara 30034 Mira / IT | 06 /
SORATO, Claudia 30034 Mira / IT | 07 /
SPADONI, Luca 30034 Mira / IT | [2023/52] | Representative(s) | Paredes Rojas, José Francisco, et al Reckitt Benckiser Corporate Services Limited Legal Department - Patents Group Dansom Lane Hull HU8 7DS / GB | [2023/52] | Application number, filing date | 22707399.6 | 17.02.2022 | [2023/52] | WO2022EP53892 | Priority number, date | GB20210002325 | 19.02.2021 Original published format: GB 202102325 | [2023/52] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2022175363 | Date: | 25.08.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/34] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4294905 | Date: | 27.12.2023 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 25.08.2022 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2023/52] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 25.08.2022 | Classification | IPC: | C11D3/395, C11D11/00, C11D3/00, C11D3/37 | [2023/52] | CPC: |
C11D3/3951 (EP,US);
C11D3/0021 (EP,US);
C11D3/3776 (EP,US);
C11D3/38609 (US);
C11D3/38627 (US);
C11D3/38636 (US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/52] | Title | German: | WASCHMITTELZUSAMMENSETZUNG | [2023/52] | English: | LAUNDRY COMPOSITION | [2023/52] | French: | COMPOSITION DE LESSIVE | [2023/52] | Entry into regional phase | 04.08.2023 | National basic fee paid | 04.08.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 04.08.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 04.08.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 04.08.2023 | Examination requested [2023/52] | 04.08.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 03.01.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XI]WO0202725 (PROCTER & GAMBLE [US], et al); | [A]US6340661 (VAN DEURZEN MARIA PETRA [NL], et al); | [I]WO2015112339 (PROCTER & GAMBLE [US]) | by applicant | EP0907703 | EP0964910 | EP1268731 | EP1941015 |