EP4301218 - CALIBRATION SYSTEM FOR AN ESOPHAGUS CATHETER WITH A BALLOON PROBE FOR DETERMINING ESOPHAGEAL PRESSURE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 08.12.2023 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 09.09.2022 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 15.03.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.05.2024 | Change: Validation states | published on 05.06.2024 [2024/23] | 03.05.2024 | Change - extension states | published on 05.06.2024 [2024/23] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hamilton Medical AG Via Crusch 8 7402 Bonaduz / CH | [2024/02] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SCHWENNINGER, David 7012 Felsberg / CH | [2024/02] | Representative(s) | Schmitt-Nilson Schraud Waibel Wohlfrom Patentanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Pelkovenstraße 143 80992 München / DE | [2024/02] | Application number, filing date | 22707677.5 | 18.02.2022 | [2024/02] | WO2022EP54098 | Priority number, date | DE202110104993 | 02.03.2021 Original published format: DE102021104993 | [2024/02] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2022184471 | Date: | 09.09.2022 | Language: | DE | [2022/36] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4301218 | Date: | 10.01.2024 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 09.09.2022 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2024/02] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 09.09.2022 | Classification | IPC: | A61B5/03, A61M16/00, A61B5/00 | [2024/02] | CPC: |
A61B5/037 (EP,US);
A61B5/6853 (EP,US);
A61M16/024 (EP);
A61M16/0415 (EP);
A61B2560/0223 (EP,US);
A61B2560/06 (EP);
A61B5/4836 (EP);
A61B5/7221 (EP);
A61M16/0409 (EP);
A61M16/0434 (EP);
A61M2016/0027 (EP);
A61M2016/0033 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/02] | Title | German: | KALIBRIERSYSTEM FÜR EINEN ÖSOPHAGUSKATHETER MIT BALLONSONDE ZUR BESTIMMUNG EINES ÖSOPHAGEALEN DRUCKS | [2024/02] | English: | CALIBRATION SYSTEM FOR AN ESOPHAGUS CATHETER WITH A BALLOON PROBE FOR DETERMINING ESOPHAGEAL PRESSURE | [2024/02] | French: | SYSTÈME D'ÉTALONNAGE POUR UN CATHÉTER OESOPHAGIEN AVEC UNE SONDE À BALLONNET POUR DÉTERMINER LA PRESSION OESOPHAGIENNE | [2024/02] | Entry into regional phase | 08.08.2023 | National basic fee paid | 08.08.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 08.08.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 08.08.2023 | Examination requested [2024/02] | 08.08.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 11.04.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.09.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US2015238144 (PINTEL OFER [IL]); | [XAI]US2017304154 (AZZOLINI GRAZIANO [IT], et al); | by applicant | WO2014037175 |