EP4312754 - DEVICE AND METHOD FOR DETECTING A MOVEMENT OR STOPPING OF A MOVEMENT OF A PERSON OR OF AN OBJECT IN A ROOM, OR AN EVENT RELATING TO SAID PERSON [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 05.01.2024 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 30.09.2022 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 16.03.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 31.05.2024 | Change: Validation states | published on 03.07.2024 [2024/27] | 31.05.2024 | Change - extension states | published on 03.07.2024 [2024/27] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Kapcare SA 36 boulevard du Souverain 1170 Bruxelles / BE | [2024/06] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KAPLAN, Philippe 1160 Bruxelles / BE | [2024/06] | Representative(s) | Icosa Europe Rue d'Oultremont 37 1040 Bruxelles / BE | [2024/06] | Application number, filing date | 22708138.7 | 25.02.2022 | [2024/06] | WO2022EP54862 | Priority number, date | EP20210165410 | 26.03.2021 Original published format: EP 21165410 | EP20210183963 | 06.07.2021 Original published format: EP 21183963 | [2024/06] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2022199986 | Date: | 29.09.2022 | Language: | FR | [2022/39] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4312754 | Date: | 07.02.2024 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 29.09.2022 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2024/06] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 29.09.2022 | Classification | IPC: | A61B5/11, A61B5/00 | [2024/06] | CPC: |
A61B5/1113 (EP,US);
A61B5/002 (EP);
A61B5/1115 (EP);
A61B5/1117 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/06] | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUR ERKENNUNG EINER BEWEGUNG ODER EINES ANHALTENS EINER PERSON ODER EINES OBJEKTS IN EINEM RAUM ODER EINES EREIGNISSES IN BEZUG AUF DIE PERSON | [2024/06] | English: | DEVICE AND METHOD FOR DETECTING A MOVEMENT OR STOPPING OF A MOVEMENT OF A PERSON OR OF AN OBJECT IN A ROOM, OR AN EVENT RELATING TO SAID PERSON | [2024/06] | French: | DISPOSITIF ET METHODE POUR DETECTER UN MOUVEMENT OU L'ARRET D'UN MOUVEMENT D'UNE PERSONNE OU D'UN OBJET DANS UNE PIECE, OU UN EVENEMENT RELATIF A CETTE PERSONNE | [2024/06] | Entry into regional phase | 26.10.2023 | National basic fee paid | 26.10.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 26.10.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 26.10.2023 | Examination requested [2024/06] | 26.10.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 26.03.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.02.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]JP2003290154 (SUMITOMO OSAKA CEMENT CO LTD) [A] 1-13* claim 1 *; | [A]EP2589330 (PANASONIC CORP [JP]) [A] 1-13 * claim 1 *; | [A]US2017014051 (MATSUMOTO SHUICHI [JP], et al) [A] 1-13 * claim 1 *; | [A]US2018049677 (MARRA ALEXANDRE RODRIGUES [BR], et al) [A] 1-13 * figures 10-13 *; | [A]WO2019063808 (KAPCARE SA [BE]) [A] 1-13 * page 1, lines 5-10; claim 1 * * page 10, line 23 - page 11, line 15 * | by applicant | EP3687379 |