EP4288681 - SOUND-PROOFED PLANETARY GEARBOX, AND WIND TURBINE COMPRISING SUCH A GEARBOX [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 10.11.2023 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 12.08.2022 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 18.03.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.04.2024 | Change: Validation states | published on 15.05.2024 [2024/20] | 12.04.2024 | Change - extension states | published on 15.05.2024 [2024/20] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states FM Energie GmbH & Co. KG Im Rosengarten 16 64646 Heppenheim / DE | [2023/50] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MITSCH, Franz 64646 Heppenheim / DE | [2023/50] | Representative(s) | Benz, Jürgen Heumann Rechts- und Patentanwälte Spessartring 63 64287 Darmstadt / DE | [2023/50] | Application number, filing date | 22708308.6 | 04.02.2022 | [2023/50] | WO2022EP25040 | Priority number, date | EP20210020062 | 08.02.2021 Original published format: EP 21020062 | [2023/50] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2022167155 | Date: | 11.08.2022 | Language: | DE | [2022/32] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4288681 | Date: | 13.12.2023 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 11.08.2022 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2023/50] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 11.08.2022 | Classification | IPC: | F16H57/00, F03D15/00, F16H57/08 | [2023/50] | CPC: |
F16H57/0006 (EP);
F16H57/08 (EP);
F03D15/00 (EP);
F05B2260/40311 (EP);
F16H2057/0012 (EP);
Y02E10/72 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/50] | Title | German: | SCHALLENTKOPPELTES PLANETENGETRIEBE UND WINDKRAFTANLAGE MIT SOLCH EINEM GETRIEBE | [2023/50] | English: | SOUND-PROOFED PLANETARY GEARBOX, AND WIND TURBINE COMPRISING SUCH A GEARBOX | [2023/50] | French: | BOÎTE DE VITESSES À TRAIN PLANÉTAIRE INSONORISÉE ET ÉOLIENNE COMPRENANT UNE TELLE BOÎTE DE VITESSES | [2023/50] | Entry into regional phase | 29.08.2023 | National basic fee paid | 29.08.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 29.08.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 10.08.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 29.08.2023 | Examination requested [2023/50] | 29.08.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.02.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]GB2002488 (MANNESMANN AG) [A] 1-12 * the whole document *; | [XAI]JPH08166050 (MITSUBISHI HEAVY IND LTD) [X] 1 * paragraphs [0027] - [0049] * * figure 1 * [A] 2-9 [I] 10-12; | [A]DE10230861 (ZAHNRADFABRIK FRIEDRICHSHAFEN [DE]) [A] 1-12 * the whole document *; | [A]DE102011075916 (ZAHNRADFABRIK FRIEDRICHSHAFEN [DE]) [A] 1-12* the whole document *; | [XAI]DE102012105549 (ZF LENKSYSTEME GMBH [DE]) [X] 1,9 * paragraphs [0010] - [0029] * * figures 1a-3 * [A] 2-8 [I] 10-12; | [XAI]WO2018188692 (SCHAEFFLER TECHNOLOGIES AG [DE]) [X] 1 * page 3, line 25 - page 9, line 25 * * figures 1-3 * [A] 2-9 [I] 10-12 | by applicant | WO2015055291 |