EP4288941 - ANNOTATION OF TWO-DIMENSIONAL IMAGES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 10.11.2023 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 12.08.2022 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 18.03.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.04.2024 | Change: Validation states | published on 08.05.2024 [2024/19] | 05.04.2024 | Change - extension states | published on 08.05.2024 [2024/19] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Inait SA Avenue du Tribunal-Fédéral 34 1005 Lausanne / CH | [2023/50] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ATANASOAEI, Constantin Cosmin 1005 Lausanne / CH | 02 /
LÜTGEHETMANN, Daniel Milan 1005 Lausanne / CH | 03 /
ZAGANIDIS, Dimitri 1005 Lausanne / CH | 04 /
RAHMON, John 1005 Lausanne / CH | 05 /
DE GRUTTOLA, Michele 1005 Lausanne / CH | [2023/50] | Representative(s) | Fish & Richardson P.C. Highlight Business Towers Mies-van-der-Rohe-Straße 8 80807 München / DE | [2023/50] | Application number, filing date | 22708359.9 | 26.01.2022 | [2023/50] | WO2022EP51810 | Priority number, date | GR20210100068 | 02.02.2021 Original published format: GR 20210100068 | US202117179596 | 19.02.2021 Original published format: US202117179596 | [2023/50] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2022167298 | Date: | 11.08.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/32] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4288941 | Date: | 13.12.2023 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 11.08.2022 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2023/50] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 11.08.2022 | Classification | IPC: | G06V20/64, G06V10/774, G06V10/12, G06T7/73 | [2023/50] | CPC: |
G06V20/64 (EP,KR);
G06V10/774 (EP,KR);
G06T7/73 (EP,KR);
G06V10/12 (EP,KR);
G06T2207/20081 (EP,KR);
G06T2207/20084 (EP,KR);
G06T2207/30244 (EP,KR)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/50] | Title | German: | ANMERKUNG VON ZWEIDIMENSIONALEN BILDERN | [2023/50] | English: | ANNOTATION OF TWO-DIMENSIONAL IMAGES | [2023/50] | French: | ANNOTATION D'IMAGES BIDIMENSIONNELLES | [2023/50] | Entry into regional phase | 30.08.2023 | National basic fee paid | 30.08.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 30.08.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 30.08.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 30.08.2023 | Examination requested [2023/50] | 30.08.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.08.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XI] - ZHANG SHANXIN ET AL, "Vehicle global 6-DoF pose estimation under traffic surveillance camera", ISPRS JOURNAL OF PHOTOGRAMMETRY AND REMOTE SENSING, AMSTERDAM [U.A.] : ELSEVIER, AMSTERDAM, NL, vol. 159, doi:10.1016/J.ISPRSJPRS.2019.11.005, ISSN 0924-2716, (20191126), pages 114 - 128, (20191126), XP085961741 [X] 1-6,10,11,13,17 * sections 3-5;; figures 3,6 * [I] 7-9,12,14-16 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.isprsjprs.2019.11.005 | [A] - XIANG YU ET AL, "Beyond PASCAL: A benchmark for 3D object detection in the wild", IEEE WINTER CONFERENCE ON APPLICATIONS OF COMPUTER VISION, IEEE, (20140324), doi:10.1109/WACV.2014.6836101, pages 75 - 82, XP032609963 [A] 1-17 * section 4;; figure 5 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/WACV.2014.6836101 |