EP4288260 - METHOD FOR PRODUCING AN RPET PLASTIC MATERIAL FOR USE IN A THIN WALL INJECTION MOLDING PROCESS AND HOLLOW BODY PRODUCED IN THE THIN WALL INJECTION MOLDING PROCESS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 10.11.2023 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 12.08.2022 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 18.03.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.04.2024 | Change: Validation states | published on 15.05.2024 [2024/20] | 12.04.2024 | Change - extension states | published on 15.05.2024 [2024/20] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ALPLA Werke Alwin Lehner GmbH & Co. KG Allmendstrasse 81 6971 Hard / AT | [2023/50] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SIEGL, Robert 6850 Dornbirn / AT | 02 /
HAAS, Benjamin 6923 Lauterach / AT | [2023/50] | Representative(s) | Swisspat Riederer Hasler Patentanwälte AG Elestastrasse 8 7310 Bad Ragaz / CH | [2023/50] | Application number, filing date | 22708433.2 | 08.02.2022 | [2023/50] | WO2022EP52961 | Priority number, date | CH20210000117 | 08.02.2021 Original published format: CH 1172021 | CH20210070736 | 17.12.2021 Original published format: CH 0707362021 | [2023/50] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2022167679 | Date: | 11.08.2022 | Language: | DE | [2022/32] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4288260 | Date: | 13.12.2023 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 11.08.2022 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2023/50] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 11.08.2022 | Classification | IPC: | B29B17/00, B29C49/00, B29C49/04, B29B17/02, B29B17/04, B29K67/00, B29L31/00 | [2023/50] | CPC: |
B29B17/0042 (EP);
B29B17/02 (EP,US);
B29B9/10 (US);
B29C45/0001 (US);
B29C48/022 (EP);
B29D22/003 (US);
B29B17/04 (EP);
B29B2017/0015 (EP,US);
B29B2017/0255 (EP);
B29B2017/0268 (EP);
B29B2017/0286 (US);
B29B2017/042 (EP);
B29C2045/0091 (US);
B29C48/09 (EP);
B29C48/287 (EP);
B29C48/69 (EP);
B29C48/76 (EP);
B29C49/0005 (EP);
B29C49/04 (EP);
B29K2067/003 (EP,US);
B29K2105/0094 (US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/50] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINES RPET-KUNSTSTOFFMATERIALS ZUR VERWENDUNG IN EINEM DÜNNWAND-SPRITZGUSSVERFAHREN UND IM DÜNNWAND-SPRITZGUSSVERFAHREN HERGESTELLTER HOHLKÖRPER | [2023/50] | English: | METHOD FOR PRODUCING AN RPET PLASTIC MATERIAL FOR USE IN A THIN WALL INJECTION MOLDING PROCESS AND HOLLOW BODY PRODUCED IN THE THIN WALL INJECTION MOLDING PROCESS | [2023/50] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE PRODUCTION D'UN MATÉRIAU PLASTIQUE À BASE DE PET RECYCLÉ DESTINÉ À ÊTRE UTILISÉ DANS UN PROCÉDÉ DE MOULAGE PAR INJECTION À PAROI MINCE ET CORPS CREUX PRODUIT DANS LE PROCÉDÉ DE MOULAGE PAR INJECTION À PAROI MINCE | [2023/50] | Entry into regional phase | 06.09.2023 | National basic fee paid | 06.09.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 06.09.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 06.09.2023 | Examination requested [2023/50] | 06.09.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 13.03.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.02.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XA]US5780128 (FARHA SAID K [US]) [X] 38 * claim 7 * * column 6, line 17 - line 63 * [A] 1-37; | [X]WO03011549 (NESTLE WATERS MAN & TECHNOLOGY [FR], et al) [X] 38 * claims 1-10 *; | [A]EP1815960 (RICOH KK [JP]) [A] 1-38 * figure 1 *; | [X]WO2011088455 (INVISTA TECHNOLOGIES SARL [CH], et al) [X] 38 * run 7;; example 1 *; | [A]EP2593494 (BASF SE [DE]) [A] 1-37* claim - *; | [A]JP2014198422 (SHISEIDO CO LTD, et al) [A] 1-38 * claims 1-10 *; | [A]WO2018127431 (ALPLA WERKE ALWIN LEHNER GMBH & CO KG [AT]) [A] 1-38 * claims 1-17 *; | [A] - AWAJA F ET AL, "Recycling of PET", EUROPEAN POLYMER JOURNAL, PERGAMON PRESS LTD OXFORD, GB, (20050701), vol. 41, no. 7, doi:10.1016/J.EURPOLYMJ.2005.02.005, ISSN 0014-3057, pages 1453 - 1477, XP004871122 [A] 1-38 * siehe Kapiteln 2 "Recycled PET" und 6 "ISBM process" * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.eurpolymj.2005.02.005 | [A] - AWAJA ET AL, "Injection stretch blow moulding process of reactive extruded recycled PET and virgin PET blends", EUROPEAN POLYMER JOURNAL, PERGAMON PRESS LTD OXFORD, GB, (20051101), vol. 41, no. 11, ISSN 0014-3057, pages 2614 - 2634, XP005059259 [A] 1-38 * the whole document * | by applicant | WO9720886 |