EP4305684 - METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR PRODUCING AN ELECTRODE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 15.12.2023 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 16.09.2022 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 18.03.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.05.2024 | Change: Validation states | published on 12.06.2024 [2024/24] | 10.05.2024 | Change - extension states | published on 12.06.2024 [2024/24] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Bayerische Motoren Werke Aktiengesellschaft Petuelring 130 80809 München / DE | [2024/03] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
JEONG, Dongho 85579 Neubiberg / DE | [2024/03] | Application number, filing date | 22708535.4 | 23.02.2022 | [2024/03] | WO2022EP54495 | Priority number, date | DE202110105458 | 08.03.2021 Original published format: DE102021105458 | [2024/03] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2022189144 | Date: | 15.09.2022 | Language: | DE | [2022/37] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4305684 | Date: | 17.01.2024 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.09.2022 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2024/03] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 15.09.2022 | Classification | IPC: | H01M4/04, B05C5/00, B05C5/02, B05D3/02 | [2024/03] | CPC: |
H01M4/0435 (EP,KR);
H01M4/0471 (EP,KR,US);
B05C11/025 (EP,KR);
B05C9/12 (EP,KR);
B05C9/14 (EP,KR);
B05D3/0263 (EP,KR);
B05D3/0281 (EP,KR);
B05D3/12 (EP,KR);
B05D5/12 (EP,KR);
B05D7/14 (EP,KR);
H01M10/05 (EP,KR);
H01M10/0525 (US);
H01M4/04 (EP,KR);
H01M4/0404 (US);
H01M4/13 (EP,KR);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/03] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINER ELEKTRODE | [2024/03] | English: | METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR PRODUCING AN ELECTRODE | [2024/03] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET APPAREIL DE PRODUCTION D'UNE ÉLECTRODE | [2024/03] | Entry into regional phase | 20.07.2023 | National basic fee paid | 20.07.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 20.07.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 20.07.2023 | Examination requested [2024/03] | 20.07.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 09.04.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.02.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XAI]US2013074711 (UEMATSU IKUO [JP], et al) [X] 1,3,4,7,8,10,11,13-15 * paragraphs [0002] - [0003] - [0 13] - [0028] - [0 34] - [0035] - [0 37] - [0039]; figures 1-6 * [A] 2,5,12[I] 6,9; | [XAI]DE102019111409 (GM GLOBAL TECH OPERATIONS LLC [US]) [X] 1,4,7,13-15 * paragraphs [0001] , [0 66] - [0080]; figures 1-7 * [A] 2,5,12 [I] 6,9; | [XAI]WO2020137436 (PANASONIC IP MAN CO LTD [JP]) [X] 1,4,7,8,10,11,13-15 * paragraphs [0009] - [0053]; figures 1-2 * [A] 2,5,12 [I] 6,9 |