Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP Patent family: EP4309257 Family dossiers alerts: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):  

CN202280021811 DK2022050035W EP22709175 US202218550270



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated





TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US2024162711Global Dossier 16.05.2024A1
Priority number Date
DKPA202170117 16.03.2021
WO2022DK50035 02.03.2022
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
CN116998082Global Dossier 03.11.2023A
Priority number Date
DKPA202170117 16.03.2021
WO2022DK50035 02.03.2022
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
EP4309257Global Dossier 24.01.2024A1
Priority number Date
DKPA202170117 16.03.2021
WO2022DK50035 02.03.2022
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
WO2022194330Global Dossier 22.09.2022A1
Priority number Date
DKPA202170117 16.03.2021