Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP Patent family: EP4305484 Family dossiers alerts: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):  

EP2022055443W EP21161508 EP22709327 US202218549605



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated





TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US2025028161Global Dossier 23.01.2025A1
Priority number Date
WO2022EP55443 03.03.2022
EP21161508 09.03.2021
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
EP4305484Global Dossier 17.01.2024A1
Priority number Date
WO2022EP55443 03.03.2022
EP21161508 09.03.2021
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
WO2022189261Global Dossier 15.09.2022A1
Priority number Date
EP21161508 09.03.2021
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
EP4057047Global Dossier 14.09.2022A1
Priority number Date
EP21161508 09.03.2021