EP4288718 - REDUCED TEMPERATURE WATER SUPPLY MODE IN A WATER PROVISION SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 07.06.2024 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 10.11.2023 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 12.08.2022 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 23.03.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.06.2024 | New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Octopus Energy Heating Limited UK House 164-182 Oxford Street London, W1D 1NN / GB | [2023/50] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KONOWALCZYK, Peter London Greater London EC1N 2HT / GB | [2023/50] | Representative(s) | IK-IP LTD 3 Lloyd's Avenue London, Greater London EC3N 3DS / GB | [2023/50] | Application number, filing date | 22709382.0 | 07.02.2022 | [2023/50] | WO2022IB51068 | Priority number, date | GB20210001678 | 07.02.2021 Original published format: GB 202101678 | GB20210009593 | 02.07.2021 Original published format: GB 202109593 | GB20210009594 | 02.07.2021 Original published format: GB 202109594 | GB20210009596 | 02.07.2021 Original published format: GB 202109596 | GB20210009597 | 02.07.2021 Original published format: GB 202109597 | GB20210009598 | 02.07.2021 Original published format: GB 202109598 | GB20210009599 | 02.07.2021 Original published format: GB 202109599 | GB20210009600 | 02.07.2021 Original published format: GB 202109600 | GB20210011070 | 02.08.2021 Original published format: GB 202111070 | [2023/50] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2022168037 | Date: | 11.08.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/32] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4288718 | Date: | 13.12.2023 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 11.08.2022 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2023/50] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 11.08.2022 | Classification | IPC: | F24D19/10, F28D20/02, G05B17/02, G06Q50/06 | [2023/50] | CPC: |
F24D19/1051 (EP);
F24D19/1054 (EP,KR,US);
F24D17/02 (KR);
F24H15/156 (EP);
F24H15/174 (EP,KR);
F24H15/176 (EP,KR);
F24H15/20 (EP);
F24H15/212 (KR);
F24H15/215 (EP);
F24H15/219 (EP);
F24H15/238 (EP);
F24H15/254 (EP);
F24H15/269 (EP);
F24H15/281 (EP);
F24H15/37 (EP);
F24H15/395 (EP);
F24H15/421 (EP);
F24H15/45 (EP);
F24H9/2007 (EP);
F24H9/2021 (EP);
F28D20/028 (EP,KR);
G06Q10/063 (EP,KR);
G06Q30/0206 (EP);
G06Q50/06 (EP,KR);
F24D2200/08 (EP,KR);
F24D2200/12 (EP,KR,US);
F24D2220/04 (US);
F24D2220/10 (EP,KR,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/50] | Title | German: | WASSERZUFUHRMODUS MIT VERRINGERTER TEMPERATUR IN EINEM WASSERBEREITSTELLUNGSSYSTEM | [2023/50] | English: | REDUCED TEMPERATURE WATER SUPPLY MODE IN A WATER PROVISION SYSTEM | [2023/50] | French: | MODE D'APPROVISIONNEMENT EN EAU À TEMPÉRATURE RÉDUITE DANS UN SYSTÈME D'APPROVISIONNEMENT EN EAU | [2023/50] | Entry into regional phase | 04.09.2023 | National basic fee paid | 04.09.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 04.09.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 04.09.2023 | Examination requested [2023/50] | 04.09.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 25.01.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 10.06.2024 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.02.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XYI]US2016010878 (LEE HOHYUN [US], et al); | [Y]EP3173703 (SHARP KK [JP]); | [A]CN108050707 (CHENGDU CHIFFO ELECTRONICS CO LTD); | [A]WO2020001746 (OBLAMATIK AG [CH]) |