Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2024084221 | Global Dossier | 14.03.2024 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2022US17187 | 22.02.2022 | US202218259803 | 22.02.2022 | US202163153402 | 25.02.2021 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2024508425 | Global Dossier | 27.02.2024 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2022US17187 | 22.02.2022 | US202163153402 | 25.02.2021 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN116724105 | Global Dossier | 08.09.2023 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2022US17187 | 22.02.2022 | US202163153402 | 25.02.2021 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP4298193 | Global Dossier | 03.01.2024 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2022US17187 | 22.02.2022 | US202163153402 | 25.02.2021 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2022182615 | Global Dossier | 01.09.2022 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US202163153402 | 25.02.2021 |