EP4298193 - DETERGENT FORMULATION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 01.12.2023 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 03.09.2022 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 23.03.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.04.2024 | Change: Validation states | published on 29.05.2024 [2024/22] | 27.04.2024 | Change - extension states | published on 29.05.2024 [2024/22] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Dow Silicones Corporation 2200 West Salzburg Road Midland, Michigan 48686 / US | [2024/01] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
NAD, Saugata 7180 Seneffe / BE | 02 /
CREUTZ, Serge 7180 Seneffe / BE | 03 /
VANDEMEULEBROUCKE, Flore 7180 Seneffe / BE | 04 /
BENBAKOURA, Rahma 7180 Seneffe / BE | [2024/01] | Representative(s) | Jewell, Catherine Mary Beck Greener LLP Fulwood House 12 Fulwood Place London WC1V 6HR / GB | [2024/01] | Application number, filing date | 22709483.6 | 22.02.2022 | [2024/01] | WO2022US17187 | Priority number, date | US202163153402P | 25.02.2021 Original published format: US 202163153402 P | [2024/01] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2022182615 | Date: | 01.09.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/35] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4298193 | Date: | 03.01.2024 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 01.09.2022 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2024/01] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 01.09.2022 | Classification | IPC: | C11D3/22 | [2024/01] | CPC: |
C11D3/225 (EP);
C11D1/94 (US);
C11D17/0086 (US);
C11D3/386 (US);
C11D2111/12 (US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/01] | Title | German: | WASCHMITTELFORMULIERUNG | [2024/01] | English: | DETERGENT FORMULATION | [2024/01] | French: | FORMULATION DE DÉTERGENT | [2024/01] | Entry into regional phase | 05.09.2023 | National basic fee paid | 05.09.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 05.09.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 05.09.2023 | Examination requested [2024/01] | 05.09.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 03.01.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US2004127700 (SCHLESIGER HARTWIG [DE], et al) [A] 1-10 * claims 1-3 *; | [A]EP2083066 (PROCTER & GAMBLE [US]) [A] 1-10 * claims 1-13 *; | [A]EP3572435 (PANASONIC IP MAN CO LTD [JP]) [A] 1-10* claims 1,2 *; | [A]WO2020051049 (DOW GLOBAL TECHNOLOGIES LLC [US], et al) [A] 1-10 * claims 1-9 * | by applicant | US6974789 | - J. P. SIBILIA, A Guide to Materials Characterization and Chemical Analysis, VCH, (19880000), pages 81 - 84 | - G. BARTELMUSR. KETTERER, Zeitschrift fuer Analytische Chemie, Springer, (19770000), vol. 286, pages 161 - 190 |