Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP Patent family: EP4302444 Family dossiers alerts: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):  

CN202280018125 EP22709813 IB2022051950 US202218549135



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated





TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US2024172199Global Dossier 23.05.2024A1
Priority number Date
WO2022IB51950 04.03.2022
US202218549135 04.03.2022
US202163156807 04.03.2021
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
CN116918293Global Dossier 20.10.2023A
Priority number Date
WO2022IB51950 04.03.2022
US202163156807 04.03.2021
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
EP4302444Global Dossier 10.01.2024A1
Priority number Date
WO2022IB51950 04.03.2022
US202163156807 04.03.2021
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
WO2022185281Global Dossier 09.09.2022A1
Priority number Date
US202163156807 04.03.2021