EP4380479 - EXTERNAL FIXATOR, KIT COMPRISING THE SAME, AND METHOD OF FIXATION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 10.05.2024 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 17.03.2023 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 24.03.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.08.2024 | Amendment by applicant | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Kings Tree Innovations Limited c/o Sandison Easson & Co Rex Buildings Alderley Road Wilmslow, Cheshire SK9 1HY / GB | [2024/24] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BELL, David Robert East Didsbury, Greater Manchester M20 5ND / GB | [2024/24] | Representative(s) | Cavalier, Marcus Alexander Mawson Minerva Intellectual Property Consultancy Ltd. The Old School House School Lane Stadhampton Oxford OX44 7TR / GB | [2024/24] | Application number, filing date | 22710158.1 | 01.03.2022 | [2024/24] | WO2022IB51786 | Priority number, date | GB20210012724 | 07.09.2021 Original published format: GB 202112724 | [2024/24] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2023037169 | Date: | 16.03.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/11] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4380479 | Date: | 12.06.2024 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 16.03.2023 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2024/24] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 16.03.2023 | Classification | IPC: | A61B17/64, A61B17/17, A61B17/00 | [2024/24] | CPC: |
A61B17/6425 (EP,GB,KR);
A61B17/171 (EP,GB,KR);
A61B17/17 (GB);
A61B17/1775 (EP,KR);
A61B17/1782 (EP,KR);
A61B17/60 (GB);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/24] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | EXTERNER FIXATEUR, KIT DAMIT UND BEFESTIGUNGSVERFAHREN | [2024/24] | English: | EXTERNAL FIXATOR, KIT COMPRISING THE SAME, AND METHOD OF FIXATION | [2024/24] | French: | FIXATEUR EXTERNE, KIT LE COMPRENANT ET PROCÉDÉ DE FIXATION | [2024/24] | Entry into regional phase | 04.03.2024 | National basic fee paid | 04.03.2024 | Designation fee(s) paid | 04.03.2024 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 04.03.2024 | Examination requested [2024/24] | 04.03.2024 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 27.08.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 04.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [AD]GB2489471 (BATH MED ENG INST [GB]); | [X]WO2015167581 (WRIGHT MEDICAL TECH INC [US]); | [XD]CN109171844 (3RD HOSPITAL HEBEI MEDICAL UNIV) | by applicant | EP0512792 | US6565563 | US2012029517 | US8246561 | GB2489471 | CN102783998 | CN109171844 |