EP4304962 - CABLE STACKER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 15.12.2023 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 16.09.2022 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 24.03.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.05.2024 | Change: Validation states | published on 19.06.2024 [2024/25] | 17.05.2024 | Change - extension states | published on 19.06.2024 [2024/25] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Schleuniger AG Bierigutstrasse 9 3608 Thun / CH | [2024/03] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KAMPMANN, Roland 58456 Witten / DE | 02 /
BÜGLER, Manuel 45127 Essen / DE | 03 /
BÖHM, Michael 42499 Hückeswagen / DE | [2024/03] | Representative(s) | PPR AG BGZ Rotenbodenstrasse 12 9497 Triesenberg / LI | [2024/03] | Application number, filing date | 22710177.1 | 09.03.2022 | [2024/03] | WO2022IB52114 | Priority number, date | WO2021IB51953 | 09.03.2021 Original published format: PCT/IB2021/051953 | [2024/03] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2022190005 | Date: | 15.09.2022 | Language: | DE | [2022/37] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4304962 | Date: | 17.01.2024 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.09.2022 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2024/03] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 15.09.2022 | Classification | IPC: | B65G57/18, B21D43/28, H01R43/28 | [2024/03] | CPC: |
B65G57/186 (EP,KR,US);
B65G21/2072 (US);
B65G43/00 (KR);
B65G47/24 (US);
B65G47/44 (US);
B65G2201/0217 (KR,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/03] | Validation states | MA | 09.10.2023 | TN | 09.10.2023 | Title | German: | KABELSTAPLER | [2024/03] | English: | CABLE STACKER | [2024/03] | French: | EMPILEUR DE CÂBLES | [2024/03] | Entry into regional phase | 09.10.2023 | National basic fee paid | 09.10.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 09.10.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 03.08.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 09.10.2023 | Examination requested [2024/03] | 09.10.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US4777711 (FORKNER ROBERT R [US], et al) [A] 1 * column 5, line 14 - line 34; figures 12,13 *; | [XAI]CH690947 (KOMAX HOLDING AG [CH]) [X] 1,6-8,10 * abstract * [A] 2-5,11-17 [I] 9; | [XDAI]DE102017202502 (SCHAEFER WERKZEUG & SONDERMA [DE]) [XD] 1,6-8,10 * figure - * [A] 2-5,11-17 [I] 9; | [A]EP3648270 (KOMAX HOLDING AG [CH]) [A] 1* paragraph [0041] - paragraph [0042]; figure 2 * | by applicant | US4793759 | DE102017202502 |