Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2024150483 | Global Dossier | 09.05.2024 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2022US16776 | 17.02.2022 | US202218546751 | 17.02.2022 | US202163150475 | 17.02.2021 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR20230167025 | Global Dossier | 07.12.2023 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2022US16776 | 17.02.2022 | US202163150475 | 17.02.2021 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2024508746 | Global Dossier | 28.02.2024 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2022US16776 | 17.02.2022 | US202163150475 | 17.02.2021 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN117203236 | Global Dossier | 08.12.2023 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2022US16776 | 17.02.2022 | US202163150475 | 17.02.2021 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA3208339 | Global Dossier | 25.08.2022 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2022US16776 | 17.02.2022 | US202163150475 | 17.02.2021 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU2022223692 | Global Dossier | 21.09.2023 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2022US16776 | 17.02.2022 | US202163150475 | 17.02.2021 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP4294843 | Global Dossier | 27.12.2023 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2022US16776 | 17.02.2022 | US202163150475 | 17.02.2021 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2022178114 | Global Dossier | 25.08.2022 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US202163150475 | 17.02.2021 |