EP4294843 - COMPOSITIONS COMPRISING 4-1BB AND OX40 BINDING PROTEINS AND METHODS OF USE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 24.11.2023 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 26.08.2022 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 24.03.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.04.2024 | Change: Validation states | published on 22.05.2024 [2024/21] | 19.04.2024 | Change - extension states | published on 22.05.2024 [2024/21] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Aptevo Research and Development LLC 2401 4th Avenue Suite 1050 Seattle, WA 98121 / US | [2023/52] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BIENVENUE, David Leonard Seattle, Washington 98121 / US | [2023/52] | Representative(s) | FRKelly Waterways House Grand Canal Quay Dublin D02 PD39 / IE | [N/P] |
Former [2023/52] | FRKelly 27 Clyde Road Dublin D04 F838 / IE | Application number, filing date | 22710217.5 | 17.02.2022 | [2023/52] | WO2022US16776 | Priority number, date | US202163150475P | 17.02.2021 Original published format: US 202163150475 P | [2023/52] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2022178114 | Date: | 25.08.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/34] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4294843 | Date: | 27.12.2023 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 25.08.2022 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2023/52] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 25.08.2022 | Classification | IPC: | C07K16/28, A61P35/00 | [2023/52] | CPC: |
C07K16/2878 (EP,KR,US);
A61K39/39591 (KR,US);
A61K47/183 (KR,US);
A61K47/20 (KR);
A61K47/26 (KR,US);
A61K9/08 (KR);
A61P35/00 (EP,KR);
A61K2039/505 (EP,KR);
C07K2317/31 (EP,KR,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/52] | Title | German: | ZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN MIT 4-1BB- UND OX40-BINDENDEN PROTEINEN UND VERFAHREN ZUR VERWENDUNG | [2023/52] | English: | COMPOSITIONS COMPRISING 4-1BB AND OX40 BINDING PROTEINS AND METHODS OF USE | [2023/52] | French: | COMPOSITIONS COMPRENANT DES PROTÉINES DE LIAISON À 4-1BB ET OX40 ET LEURS PROCÉDÉS D'UTILISATION | [2023/52] | Entry into regional phase | 22.08.2023 | National basic fee paid | 22.08.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 22.08.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 22.08.2023 | Examination requested [2023/52] | 22.08.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 08.04.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 09.01.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [I]US2018118841 (ELLMARK PETER [SE], et al) [I] 1-65* paragraphs [0001] , [0010] - [0017] - [0 28] , [0126] , [0127] , [0138] - [0147] - [0206] - [0218] - [0605] - [0610]; example 14 *; | [I]WO2020011966 (F STAR BETA LTD [GB]) [I] 1-65 * page 52, line 27 - page 53, line 19 * * page 1, lines 3-7 * * page 7, line 5 - page 12, line 34 * * page 55, line 1 - page 56, line 23 *; | [A]WO2020150496 (COMPASS THERAPEUTICS LLC [US]) [A] 1-65 * page 3, paragraph 2 - page 4, paragraph 1 * * page 4, paragraph 2 - page 14, paragraph 5 * * page 47, paragraph 2 - page 51, paragraph 3 * * page 87, paragraph 2 - page 111, paragraph 1 *; | [XP]WO2021030488 (BIENVENUE DAVID LEONARD [US], et al) [XP] 32-34 * paragraphs [0085] - [0093] - [0193] - [0198] - [0384] - [0391]; sequences 17,18,30,31 *; | [A] - WANG W ET AL, "ANTIBODY STRUCTURE, INSTABILITY, AND FORMULATION", JOURNAL OF PHARMACEUTICAL SCIENCES, AMERICAN CHEMICAL SOCIETY AND AMERICAN PHARMACEUTICAL ASSOCIATION, US, (20070101), vol. 96, no. 1, doi:10.1002/JPS.20727, ISSN 0022-3549, pages 1 - 26, XP009084505 [A] 1-65 * page 15, column r, paragraph 2 - page 17, column l, paragraph 1 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/jps.20727 | [A] - MIGUEL GASPAR ET AL, "CD137/OX40 Bispecific Antibody Induces Potent Antitumor Activity that Is Dependent on Target Coengagement", CANCER IMMUNOLOGY RESEARCH, US, (20200409), vol. 8, no. 6, doi:10.1158/2326-6066.CIR-19-0798, ISSN 2326-6066, pages 781 - 793, XP055740060 [A] 1-65 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1158/2326-6066.CIR-19-0798 | by applicant | US5225539 | US2013095097 | US2013129723 | - YE et al., Oncolmmunology, (20130000), vol. 2, page e27184 | - MONTLER et al., Clin Transl Immunology, (20160000), vol. 5, page e70 | - CHESTER et al., Blood, (20180000), vol. 131, pages 39 - 57 | - OHSIMA et al., J. Immunology, (19970000), vol. 159, pages 3838 - 3848 | - IMURA et al., J. Exp. Med., (19960000), vol. 183, pages 2185 - 2195 | - MAXWELL et al., J. Immunology, (20000000), vol. 164, pages 107 - 112 | - GOUGH et al., J. Immunotherapy, (20100000), vol. 33, no. 8, pages 798 - 809 | - JONES et al., Nature, (19860000), vol. 321, pages 522 - 525 | - RIECHMANN et al., Nature, (19880000), vol. 332, pages 323 - 327 | - VERHOEYEN et al., Science, vol. 239, pages 1534 - 1536 | - ROGUSKA et al., Proc. Natl. Acad. Sci., USA, (19940000), vol. 91, no. 3, pages 969 - 973 | - ROGUSKA et al., Protein Eng., (19960000), vol. 9, no. 10, pages 895 - 904 | - KABAT EAWU TT, Ann NY Acad Sci, (19710000), vol. 190, pages 382 - 391 | - CHOTHIALESK, J. Mol. Biol., (19870000), vol. 196, pages 901 - 917 | - BROCHET, X et al., Nucl. Acids Res, (20080000), vol. 36, pages W503 - 508 | - PUTNAM, The Plasma Proteins, Academic Press, (19870000), vol. V, pages 49 - 140 | - PADLAN, Mol. Immunol., (19940000), vol. 31, pages 169 - 217 | - EDELMAN, G.M. et al., Proc. Natl. Acad. USA, (19690000), vol. 63, pages 78 - 85 | - WARD et al., Therap. Immunol., (19950000), vol. 2, pages 77 - 94 |