EP4308822 - METHOD AND LEVELLING SCREW FOR INSTALLING AN ATTACHMENT PART [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 22.12.2023 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 23.09.2022 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 25.03.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.05.2024 | Change: Validation states | published on 26.06.2024 [2024/26] | 24.05.2024 | Change - extension states | published on 26.06.2024 [2024/26] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hilti Aktiengesellschaft Feldkircherstrasse 100 9494 Schaan / LI | [2024/04] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ZILTENER, Michael 8854 Siebnen / CH | 02 /
GUTENSOHN, Markus 6845 Hohenems / AT | [2024/04] | Representative(s) | Hilti Aktiengesellschaft Corporate Intellectual Property Feldkircherstrasse 100 Postfach 333 9494 Schaan / LI | [2024/04] | Application number, filing date | 22710401.5 | 07.03.2022 | [2024/04] | WO2022EP55689 | Priority number, date | EP20210163156 | 17.03.2021 Original published format: EP 21163156 | [2024/04] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2022194588 | Date: | 22.09.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/38] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4308822 | Date: | 24.01.2024 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.09.2022 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2024/04] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 22.09.2022 | Classification | IPC: | F16B13/14, F16B25/00, F16B5/02, F16B39/22 | [2024/04] | CPC: |
F16B13/141 (EP,US);
F16B5/0233 (EP,US);
F16B25/0026 (EP,US);
F16B25/0042 (EP);
F16B39/225 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/04] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND NIVELLIERSCHRAUBE ZUR MONTAGE EINES ANBAUTEILS | [2024/04] | English: | METHOD AND LEVELLING SCREW FOR INSTALLING AN ATTACHMENT PART | [2024/04] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET VIS DE MISE À NIVEAU POUR L'INSTALLATION D'UNE PIÈCE DE FIXATION | [2024/04] | Entry into regional phase | 17.10.2023 | National basic fee paid | 17.10.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 17.10.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 17.10.2023 | Examination requested [2024/04] | 17.10.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 08.11.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XAI]US3897713 (GUGLE JAMES ERIC); | [XAI]EP1710453 (TOGE DUEBEL A GERHARD KG [DE]) |